Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20418

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:20-ap-02014
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2020
Terminated:May 13, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aaron Ray Robison
335 North 300 West
Logan, UT 84321
Represented By
E. Kent Winward
contact info
Plaintiff
Dakota Worrell
31 Federal Ave
Logan, UT 84321
Represented By
J. Brett Chambers
Harris Preston & Chambers, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
court Dispose Adversary Case Wed 05/13 8:32 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2014 Disposed. (ksh)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 09, 2020
16 16 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Sat 05/09 10:27 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 05/09/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Amended Motion
Thursday, May 07, 2020
15 15 order Amended Motion (order) Thu 05/07 12:06 PM
Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Order of Nondischargeability of Claims Related [+] (ksh)
Related: [-] #12
14 14 misc Settlement Agreement Thu 05/07 11:16 AM
Settlement Agreement Re Related [+] Filed by Dakota Worrell. (Chambers, J.)
Related: [-] 12 Amended Motion filed by Plaintiff Dakota Worrell
13 13 misc Pending Order Thu 05/07 11:14 AM
Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) Re:12 Amended Motion. (Chambers, J.)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Amended Motion (Motion) Thu 05/07 11:11 AM
Stipulated Amended Motion for Order of Nondischargeability of Claims Filed by Dakota Worrell. (Chambers, J.)
Related: [-]
genaty Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE) Thu 05/07 11:48 AM
Notice of Endorsemen Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection Filed by Aaron Ray Robison. (Winward, E.)
Related: [-] 13 Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) Re:12 Amended Motion. (Chambers, J.) [Order# 395342],14 Settlement Agreement Re:(related document(s):12 Amended Motion filed by Plaintiff Dakota Worrell) Filed by Dakota Worrell. (Chambers, J.)
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
generic Notice of Unsigned Default By Deputy Clerk Tue 03/31 7:30 AM
Notice of Unsigned Default By Deputy Clerk Related [+]. Debtor/Defendant's attorney was not served as per Fed. R. Bank. Pro. 7004 (g). Filed by Dakota Worrell. (djf)
Related: [-] 10 Pending Default Certificate filed by Plaintiff Dakota Worrell
Monday, March 30, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/30 4:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Dakota Worrell. (Chambers, J.). Related [+] Modified on 3/30/2020 (ksh)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Dakota Worrell,8 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Dakota Worrell,9 Affidavit filed by Plaintiff Dakota Worrell,10 Pending Default Certificate
10 10 notice Pending Default Certificate Mon 03/30 4:08 PM
Pending Default Certificate Filed by Dakota Worrell. (Chambers, J.)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Affidavit/Declaration Mon 03/30 3:17 PM
Affidavit/Declaration Related [+] SCRA Record Filed by Dakota Worrell. (Chambers, J.)
Related: [-] 7 Affidavit
8 8 notice *Notice of Hearing Mon 03/30 3:11 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Default Judgment Filed by Dakota Worrell. Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2020 at 02:00 PM at USBC Rm 341. Deadline for filing objections: 4/13/2020. (Chambers, J.)
Related: [-] 6 Application for Entry of Order/Judgment
7 7 misc Affidavit/Declaration Mon 03/30 3:05 PM
Affidavit/Declaration for Default Filed by Dakota Worrell. (Chambers, J.)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Default Judgment (Motion) Mon 03/30 3:03 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Dakota Worrell. (Chambers, J.) Modified on 3/30/2020 (ksh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Wed 02/26 10:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Service Re: Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 02/26/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice Re: the Filing of a Complaint Objecting to Your Discharge
Monday, February 24, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/24 2:47 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Aaron Robison. (Chambers, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice Re: the Filing of a Complaint Objecting to Your Discharge Mon 02/24 8:00 AM
Notice Regarding the Filing of a Complaint Objecting to Your Bankruptcy Discharge. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 22, 2020
2 2 notice Notice Sat 02/22 12:52 PM
Exhibit 1 Related [+] Exhibits 1 & 2 of Complaint Filed by Dakota Worrell. (Chambers, J.) Modified on 2/24/2020 (ksh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dakota Worrell
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 02/22 12:39 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-02014 . Complaint by Dakota Worrell against Aaron Ray Robison. Fee Amount $350. Payment to be made via Pay.gov. Nature of Suit(s): [67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)]. (Chambers, J.)
Related: [-]