Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 5:20-cv-00218
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2020
Terminated:Feb 09, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 22, 2020 3:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Aqua Finance
Defendant
Connexus Credit Union
Defendant
Enerfuze LLC
Plaintiff
Ricardo Lopez
Represented By
Amy Elizabeth Clark
Texas Riogrande Legal Aid
contact info
Eva Sikes
Texas Riogrande Legal Aid, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeannette Diana Goddard
Jeannette Goddard 6110 Lark Valley
San Antonio, TX 78242
Represented By
Amy Elizabeth Clark
Texas Riogrande Legal Aid
contact info
Eva Sikes
Texas Riogrande Legal Aid, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Jean Saenz
Barbara Saenz 2527 Wazerly Avenue
San Antonio, TX 78228
Represented By
Amy Elizabeth Clark
Texas Riogrande Legal Aid
contact info
Eva Sikes
Texas Riogrande Legal Aid, Inc.
contact info

GPO Jan 25 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 32 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz, Jeannette Diana Goddard. The United States District Clerk shall serve a copy of this report and recommendation onall parties by either electronic transmittal to all parties represented by attorneys registered as a filing user with the clerk of court, or by mailing a copy by certified mail, return receipt requested, to those not registered. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/09 12:59 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz, Jeannette Diana Goddard.The Court hereby DISMISSES this case WITH PREJUDICE, and any pending matters are hereby DISMISSED AS MOOT. The Clerks Office is INSTRUCTED to CLOSETHE CASE. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Wed 02/09 1:04 PM
Motions No Longer Referred: (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
35 35 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/08 9:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz (Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
34 34 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 01/25 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Aqua Finance, INC and Connexus Credit Union ONLY by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz (Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Report and Recommendations Tue 01/25 11:17 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re32 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz, Jeannette Diana Goddard. The United States District Clerk shall serve a copy of this report and recommendation onall parties by either electronic transmittal to all parties represented by attorneys registered as a filing user with the clerk of court, or by mailing a copy by certified mail, return receipt requested, to those not registered. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 05/04 10:00 AM
Text Order MOOTING26 Motion for Default Judgment entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer in light of the filing of Plaintiffs' second amended motion for default judgment, Dkt. No. 32. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmag)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 05/03 9:41 AM
Text Order REFERRING32 Motion for Default Judgment to Magistrate Judge Farrer. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 05/03 11:31 AM
MOTION REFERRED: referred32 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Aqua Finance, Inc., and Enerfuze, LLC d/b/a Enerfuze Water Technologies. Referral Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
32 32 motion Default Judgment Fri 04/30 10:44 PM
Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Aqua Finance, Inc., and Enerfuze, LLC d/b/a Enerfuze Water Technologies by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz. (Sikes, Eva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
31 31 4 pgs order Order Wed 03/31 4:41 PM
ORDER, that within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file an amended motion for default judgment that addresses the concerns of the Court referenced in this Order, re26 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Aqua Finance, Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze filed by Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz, Jeannette Diana Goddard. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 02/12 1:49 PM
Text Order MOOTING23 Motion for Default Judgment in light of the filing of26 Amended Motion for Default Judgment. Entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
30 30 respoth Affidavit in Support Thu 02/11 11:48 AM
(Corrected to Replace Doc#29) AFFIDAVIT in Support of26 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Aqua Finance, Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze,29 Affidavit in Support SIGNED DECLARATION - correct document filed by Ricardo Lopez. (Clark, Amy) Modified text on 2/11/2021 (wg)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 02/11 10:11 AM
Text Order REFERRING26 Motion for Default Judgment to Magistrate Judge Farrer. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 02/11 12:57 PM
MOTION REFERRED: referred26 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Aqua Finance, Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze. Referral Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
29 29 respoth Affidavit in Support Wed 02/10 11:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support of26 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Aqua Finance, Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze DECLARATION not an affidavit by Ricardo Lopez.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
28 28 respoth Affidavit in Support Wed 02/10 11:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support of26 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Aqua Finance, Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze DECLARATION not an affidavit by Barbara Jean Saenz.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
27 27 respoth Affidavit in Support Wed 02/10 11:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support of26 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Aqua Finance, Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze DECLARATION not an affidavit by Jeannette Diana Goddard.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
26 26 motion Default Judgment Wed 02/10 11:40 PM
Amended MOTION for Default Judgment against Aqua Finance, Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz. (Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
25 25 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/12 8:26 AM
ORDER that within (30) days shall file an Amended Motion for Default Judgment. re23 MOTION for Default Judgment and to set an evidentiary hearing against Aqua Finance, INC., Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze LLC dba Enerfuze Water Technologies filed by Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz, Jeannette Diana Goddard. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
24 24 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 12/18 11:31 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Enerfuze LLC d/b/a Enerfuze Water Technologies (bc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 12/18 10:17 AM
Text Order REFERRING23 Motion for Default Judgment to Magistrate Judge Farrer. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Fri 12/18 11:32 AM
MOTION REFERRED: referred23 MOTION for Default Judgment and to set an evidentiary hearing against Aqua Finance, INC., Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze LLC dba Enerfuze Water Technologies. Referral Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (bc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
23 23 motion Default Judgment Thu 12/17 11:15 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment and to set an evidentiary hearing against Aqua Finance, INC., Connexus Credit Union, and Enerfuze LLC dba Enerfuze Water Technologies by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order for hearing and default judgment
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
22 22 motion Entry of Default Wed 12/16 3:58 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Enerfuze, LLC by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz.(Sikes, Eva)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Return of Service for Enerfuze, LLC,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration in Support,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default by Clerk
Thursday, December 10, 2020
21 21 3 pgs order Order Thu 12/10 12:52 PM
ORDER, that Plaintiff must file a Clerks entry of default against Enerfuze LLC, and final default judgment against each Defendant, in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, within seven days of the date of this Order. This is the third such Order the Court has entered, failure to do so will result in the Courts dismissal of Plaintiffs claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
20 20 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 11/09 10:53 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Connexus Credit Union (rg)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 11/09 10:52 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aqua Finance. (rg)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 11/09 9:32 AM
Text Order MOOTING15 Motion for Entry of Default in light of corrected motion. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 11/09 9:33 AM
Text Order MOOTING16 Motion for Entry of Default in light of corrected motion. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 08, 2020
18 18 motion Entry of Default Sun 11/08 11:25 PM
CORRECTED MOTION for Entry of Default against Connexus Credit Union by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - return of service on Connexus,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Amy Clark,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
17 17 motion Entry of Default Sun 11/08 11:23 PM
CORRECTED MOTION for Entry of Default against Aqua Finance by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - return of service on Aqua Finance,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Amy Clark,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Saturday, November 07, 2020
16 16 motion Entry of Default Sat 11/07 12:03 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Connexus Credit Union by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 06, 2020
15 15 motion Entry of Default Sat 11/07 12:02 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Aqua Finance by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 23, 2020
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/23 4:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz. Enerfuze LLC served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/23 11:13 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF MOVE FOR DEFAULT & STATUS UPDATE re12 Notice (Other) filed by Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz, Jeannette Diana Goddard. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to move for an entry of default and a default judgment against Defendant in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, within twentyone days of the date of this Order. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a proof of service on the remaining Defendant in this case pursuant to Rule 4(m) within fourteen days of the date of this Order, or the Court will dismiss this Defendant without prejudice. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
12 12 notice Notice Mon 09/28 10:47 PM
NOTICE TO THE COURT AND REQUEST FOR TIME TO SERVE ENERFUZE LLC by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz re7 Order, (Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 09/15 10:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Enerfuze LLC., C/O Paul Chancey, CEO (wg)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/15 6:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz. Connexus Credit Union served on 5/28/2020, answer due 6/18/2020. (Sikes, Eva)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/15 6:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz. Aqua Finance served on 5/28/2020, answer due 6/18/2020. (Sikes, Eva)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/15 12:13 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz. for Energuze LLC (Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 09/14 11:20 AM
ORDER that Plaintiffs to serve Defendants within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiffs fail to comply or otherwise demonstrate the requisite cause necessary to extend the time for service pursuant to Rule 4(m), the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice against Defendants after fourteen (14) days. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 05/22 4:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Aqua Finance, Connexus Credit Union. (wg)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/22 4:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz. for Connexus Credit Union (Sikes, Eva)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/22 4:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeannette Diana Goddard, Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz. for Aqua Finance, Inc. (Sikes, Eva)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2020
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/07 11:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending1 Complaint., filed by Ricardo Lopez, Barbara Jean Saenz, Jeannette Diana Goddard.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/23 8:51 AM
Text Order GRANTING2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/22 3:41 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Elizabeth Clark on behalf by Eva Sikes ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13487710) by on behalf of Ricardo Lopez.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 24, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/24 10:57 PM
COMPLAINT and jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13250737). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Ricardo Lopez.(Clark, Amy)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/25 9:08 AM
Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Tue 02/25 9:09 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
Related: [-]