Cortese v. Skanska Koch, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-01632 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 29:216(b) FLSA: Minimum wage or overtime compensation |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 23, 2020 5:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kiewit Infrastructure Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Skanska Koch, Inc.
400 Roosevelt Ave
Carteret, NJ 07008 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Skanska Koch - Kiewit JV
400 Roosevelt Avenue
Carteret, NJ 07008 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Cortese
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
101 | 101
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 01/16 12:22 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to96 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Cortese, James Kearney, John Siciliano, Jeffrey Brooks, Daniel Julio, Mark Leyble USCA Case Number 21-473. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the district courts judgment is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 1/16/2024.(km) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 01/16 12:23 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:101 USCA Mandate.(km) |