Jacobson, Karyn v. Saul, Andrew
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen L Crocker |
Referred: | Peter A Oppeneer |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-00162 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2020 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, November 02, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 11/02 8:04 AM
ORDER granting15 Stipulation for Attorney Fees Pursuant To EAJA . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/30/2020. (voc) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation
Thu 10/29 2:20 PM
Stipulation for Attorney Fees Pursuant To EAJA by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Yarnell, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Wed 08/05 11:20 AM
ORDER granting13 Joint Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/4/2020. (voc) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Remand
Tue 08/04 2:28 PM
Joint MOTION TO REMAND For Further Proceedings by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Yarnell, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/24 9:02 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Eric Charles Yarnell for Defendant Andrew Saul. (Yarnell, Eric) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Brief in Support
Mon 06/22 12:44 PM
Brief in Support of9 Social Security Hearing Transcript, by Plaintiff Karyn Jacobson (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 05/11 10:35 AM
ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/11/2020. (lak) |
|
Att: 1 Consent - Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 2 Consent - Defendant | ||
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Social Security Hearing Transcript
Fri 05/08 6:45 PM
Social Security Hearing Transcript by Defendant Andrew Saul. Brief in Support due 6/22/2020. Brief in Opposition due 8/6/2020. Brief in Reply due 8/21/2020. (Bianchi, Albert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Social Security Hearing Transcript Pt 2 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/08 6:40 PM
ANSWER, ANSWER by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Bianchi, Albert) |
|
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Thu 03/19 12:26 PM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/05 3:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (voc) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Regional Chief Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office | ||
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/03 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2639100.), filed by Karyn Jacobson. (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/03 10:47 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Karyn Jacobson. (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/26 1:06 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee due 3/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/26/2020. (jls) |
|
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Wed 02/26 10:57 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (jls) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Wed 02/26 10:57 AM
Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] ,[LINK:Order Regarding Assignment of Cases] ,[LINK:Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment] ,[LINK:Order on Dispositive Motions] . (jls) |
||
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/25 3:25 PM
Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Karyn Jacobson. (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/25 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul., filed by Karyn Jacobson. (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |