Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:20-cv-00834
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:1346 Tort Claim
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2020
Case in other court:California Eastern, 2:20-cv-00144
Last checked: Saturday Aug 22, 2020 7:07 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Plaintiff
California-American Water Company
Represented By
J Nixon Daniel, III
Beggs And Lane Rllp
contact info
David Duval Cooke
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble & Mallory LLP
contact info
Kamran Javandel
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
16 16 notice Notice Other Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/11 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 25, 2020
14 14 notice Notice Other Fri 09/25 10:08 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. The clerk will be issuing the summons(es) in a timely manner for all amended complaints filed. Due to the volume of amended complaints filed most recently, the clerk will be issuing the summons(es) as follows. Upon receipt of the NEF for the Summons Issued event, please print or download the filed one-page document with the PDF header included, showing the date of issue and civil case (member) number. Insert this dated, signed and sealed document in front of the first page of your prepared summons document, including your supplemental pages, to use for service on defendants. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
13 13 notice Notice Other Wed 09/02 4:31 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Please be advised to disregard entry filed at Dkt. No. 797 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) et al Notice of Appearance. This filing was spread incorrectly to ALL cases . Please note filing instructions per CMO No. 1 regarding correctly spreading if the document relates to all actions or relates only to particular action(s) . Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/02 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Leland DuPre on behalf of Finley Fire Equipment Co Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(DuPre, Allen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
11 11 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 02/25 3:06 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: California Eastern, 2:20-cv-00144, California-American Water Company v. USA, as DSC case 2:20-cv-834-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 8 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please see also NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 4/3/2020 9:00 AM, in Charleston Courtroom #1), J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, )
Related: [-]
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 02/25 2:50 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
9 9 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of South Carolina. Electronic transfer sent. Case Closed. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
8 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/6/2020. Added attorney J. Nixon Daniel for California-American Water Company.(Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
7 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America by California-American Water Company.(Cooke, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
Related: [-]
6 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by California-American Water Company for attorney J. Nixon Daniel III to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8717972) (Cooke, David)[Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
5 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by California-American Water Company for attorney T. Roe Frazer II to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8714415) (Cooke, David)[Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
Related: [-]
4 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff California-American Water Company. (Cooke, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
3 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020, at 02:30 PM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *David Duval Cooke* *Allen Matkins Leck Gamble & Mallory LLP* *Three Embarcadero Center, 12th Floor* *San Francisco, CA 94111-4074*. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America by California-American Water Company. Attorney Cooke, David Duval added. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8680480)(Cooke, David) [Transferred from California Eastern on 2/25/2020.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet