New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:20-cv-01710
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332fc Diversity - Foreclosure
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2020
Terminated:May 12, 2020
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2020 7:58 AM EDT
Defendant
CNW Real Estate LLC
915 Cherry Lane
Valley Stream, NY 11581
Defendant
Alexander Gellatly
118 South Smith Rd.
LaGrangeville, NY 12540
Defendant
Whitestone New Windsor LLC
915 Cherry Lane
Valley Stream, NY 11581
Defendant
Martin Zukerman
Defendant
Michael Zukerman
915 Cherry Lane
Valley Stream, NY 11581
Defendant
John Does #1 - 10
Defendant
Duffy's Route 32 LLC
5 Corporate Drive Suite 202
Central Valley, NY 10917
Defendant
Peter A. Griffith
Plaintiff
SW Valley LLC
a Florida limited liability company c/o Bridge Capital Group LLC 2200 Butts Road Suite 310
Boca Raton, FL 33431
Represented By
Scott J. Steiner
Steiner & Kostyn LLP
contact info
Kevin F. Kostyn
Steiner & Kostyn, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/12 12:20 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by SW Valley LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Kostyn, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 3:42 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CNW Real Estate LLC, Duffy's Route 32 LLC, Alexander Gellatly, Peter A. Griffith, Whitestone New Windsor LLC, Martin Zukerman, Martin Zukerman, Michael Zukerman..(dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 02/28 3:44 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott J. Steiner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Martin Zukerman, John Does #1 - 10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2020
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/27 3:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CNW Real Estate LLC, Michael Zukerman, Peter A. Griffith,Martin Zukerman, Alexander Gellatly, Whitestone New Windsor LLC, Duffy's Route 32 LLC, re:5 Complaint,. Document filed by SW Valley LLC..(Kostyn, Kevin)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against CNW Real Estate LLC, Duffy's Route 32 LLC, Alexander Gellatly, Peter A. Griffith, Whitestone New Windsor LLC, Martin Zukerman, Michael Zukerman, Martin Zukerman, John Does #1 - 10. Document filed by SW Valley LLC..(Kostyn, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Legal Description of Property,
Att: 2 Exhibit Promissory Note,
Att: 3 Exhibit Mortgage,
Att: 4 Exhibit Guaranty of Payment,
Att: 5 Exhibit Assignment of Rents
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 02/27 9:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott J. Steiner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SW Valley LLC,Peter Griffith, Martin Zukerman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 02/27 9:37 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott J. Steiner to RE-FILE re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party Martin Zukerman to the docket a second time with party text 'as Trustee of 1996 Zuckerman Family Trust' and add party "John Doe" #1-10 to the docket with corresponding party text. The pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 02/27 9:40 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 02/27 9:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 02/27 9:40 AM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/27 9:46 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Scott J. Steiner to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Party name listed on 'Schedule A' does not exactly match the party of record (Peter Griffith). The wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/26 5:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CNW Real Estate LLC, Michael Zukerman, Peter A. Griffith,Martin Zukerman, Alexander Gellatly, Whitestone New Windsor LLC, Duffy's Route 32 LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by CNW Real Estate LLC, Duffy's Route 32 LLC, Alexander Gellatly, Peter Griffith, Whitestone New Windsor LLC, Martin Zukerman, Michael Zukerman..(Steiner, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 5:47 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SW Valley LLC..(Steiner, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/26 5:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Steiner, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/26 5:32 PM
COMPLAINT against CNW Real Estate LLC, Duffy's Route 32 LLC, Alexander Gellatly, Peter Griffith, Whitestone New Windsor LLC, Martin Zukerman, Michael Zukerman. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18931477)Document filed by SW Valley LLC..(Steiner, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Property Legal Description,
Att: 2 Exhibit Promissory Note,
Att: 3 21 pgs Exhibit Mortgage,
Att: 4 Exhibit Guaranty of Payment,
Att: 5 Exhibit Assignment of Rents