Activlab, LLC v. Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Thomas Anderson |
Referred: | Charmiane G Claxton |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-02271 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2014 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 4:58 AM CST |
Defendant
Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC
a Georgia Limited Liability Company 1900 Beaver Ridge Circle
Norcross, GA 30071 |
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
Jimmy Moore
CIRCUIT COURT, 30TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT Shelby County Courthouse 140 Adams Ave. Rm. 224
Memphis, TN 38103 |
|
Plaintiff
Activlab, LLC
a Tennessee Limited Liability Company 119 S. Main Street Suite 500
Memphis, TN 38103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, December 15, 2014 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Mon 12/15 4:15 PM
JUDGMENT In accordance with the Joint Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice entered on 12/15/2014, this cause is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/15/2014. (Anderson, S.) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 12/15 1:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC. (Eckstein, Adam) |
|
Friday, November 14, 2014 | ||
26 | 26 ORDER denying23 Pending Motion as Moot Due to Settlement. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/14/14. (Anderson, S.) | |
Friday, October 31, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 4 pgs RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Fraud filed by Activlab, LLC.(Owens, Nicholas) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC.(Eckstein, Adam) | |
23 | 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Fraud by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC.(Eckstein, Adam) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Tuesday, October 07, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC, filed by Activlab, LLC. (Owens, Nicholas) | |
Friday, October 03, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER granting15 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/3/14. (Anderson, S.) | |
Thursday, October 02, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION to Amend/Correct First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint proposed order submitted filed by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC. (Eckstein, Adam) | |
Tuesday, September 23, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER finding as moot16 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/23/14. (Anderson, S.) | |
18 | 18 NOTICE by Activlab, LLC Striking Motion to Compel Discovery (Owens, Nicholas) | |
Monday, September 15, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE by Activlab, LLC of Depositions (Owens, Nicholas) | |
16 | 16 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Activlab, LLC.(Owens, Nicholas) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
15 | 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct , First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Activlab, LLC.(Owens, Nicholas) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, August 12, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 STIPULATION re13 Notice (Other) Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC. (Eckstein, Adam) | |
Friday, July 11, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE by Activlab, LLC of Filing First Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Admission (Owens, Nicholas) | |
Thursday, June 19, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC Serving Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Eckstein, Adam) | |
Thursday, June 12, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 7/20/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2015 01:15 PM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2015. (bag) | |
10 | 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/12/14. (Anderson, S.) | |
Thursday, June 05, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 6/5/2014; Court has reviewed proposed scheduling order - proposed dates acceptable; Parties instructed to resubmit proposed scheduling order to include a mediation deadline (2/20/2015) - Court to enter scheduling order; Court addressed parties as to consent to trial before a Magistrate Judge - parties will discuss with clients & advise the Court. (Plf Atty: N. Owens; Dfts Attys: D. Roberts via phone, A. Eckstein) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.)(11:33-11:40) (tlh) | |
Monday, June 02, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting .(Owens, Nicholas) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit scheduling order | ||
7 | 7 ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/2/14. (Anderson, S.) | |
Friday, May 30, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0651-1914884) by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC. (Roberts, David) | |
Monday, April 21, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC.(Eckstein, Adam) | |
Wednesday, April 16, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2014 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (bag) | |
Monday, April 14, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) | |
2 | 2 Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (csf) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC from Circuit Court of Tennessee for the Thirtieth Judicial District at Memphis, case number CT-001081-14, Div. V (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-1885918), filed by Private Label Nutraceuticals, LLC.(Eckstein, Adam) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing that will be filed in State Court, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |