Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:20-mj-00085
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2020
Terminated:Feb 26, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Feb 29, 2020 1:14 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Suzanna O Etessam-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bryson Jarell Busby (1)
Terminated: 02/26/2020
Represented By
Taly Haffar
Haffar Law
contact info
Defendant
Michael Rachael McCoy (2)
Terminated: 02/26/2020
Represented By
Kambira Jones Morgan
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/29/2020 3:20 AM CST

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.