California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 5:20-cv-00417
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2020
Terminated:May 11, 2021
Case in other court:Riverside County Superior Court, RIC 1905626
Last checked: Saturday Aug 29, 2020 2:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc.
Represented By
Sage Stone
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Christopher William Decker
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Sierra Aluminum Company
Represented By
Sage Stone
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Christopher William Decker
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ron Ramirez
Represented By
Jeffrey Scott Herman
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Aparajit Bhowmik
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Kyle R Nordrehaug
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Blake R Jones
Crosner Legal PC
contact info
Jackland K Hom
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhownik Deblouw LLP
contact info
Zachary Crosner
Crosner Legal PC
contact info
Norman B Blumenthal
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 17, 2021
38 38 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/17 12:50 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiff's Eighth, Ninth and Tenth Cause of Action with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)37 . (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
37 37 stip Dismiss Case Thu 05/13 10:03 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by plainitff Ron Ramirez.(Nordrehaug, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
36 36 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/11 4:59 PM
ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND STAYING CASE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re Notice (Other),35 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/22 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Settlement; Request to Vacate Trial Date; and Stay Case filed by defendants Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc., Sierra Aluminum Company. parties' Joint Notice(Decker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Vacating Trial Date and Staying Case
Thursday, August 06, 2020
34 34 misc Report Thu 08/06 3:55 PM
JOINT REPORT of Re ADR Proceeding filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc.. (Decker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
33 33 attorney Association of Counsel Fri 07/31 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Zachary Crosner and Blake Jones of Crosner Legal, P.C. on behalf of Plaintiff Ron Ramirez. Filed by Plaintiff Ron Ramirez (Hom, Jackland)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
32 32 order Protective Order Fri 07/10 3:31 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato re Stipulation for Protective Order31 (dts)
Related: [-]
31 31 stip Protective Order Fri 07/10 11:10 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc..(Decker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
30 30 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 06/03 2:52 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/22/2021. (npo)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 06/03 2:51 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2020. Discovery cut-off 1/25/2021. Motions cut-off 4/5/2021. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 2/22/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (npo)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2020
28 28 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 05/22 4:02 PM
The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2020. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
27 27 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 05/19 9:54 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Report26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Report Mon 05/18 1:26 PM
JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Ron Ramirez. (Herman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2020
25 25 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 03/31 3:12 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Notice of Removal18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: "Other Filings" - Miscellaneous Filings - Amended Document (Non-Motion). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 30, 2020
24 24 notice Related Case(s) Mon 03/30 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc.. SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASES PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 83.1.3.1 Related Case(s): 5:20-cv- 00509 (Moriah Holtegaard v. Howroyd-Wright Employment Agency, et al) and 5:20-cv-00587(Trayvion Terrell v. Samuel Son & Co. (USA) Inc., et al.) (Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
23 23 misc Declaration Fri 03/27 6:48 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher W. Decker re Notice (Other),18 in support of Amended Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc..(Decker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, pg 3 excel spreadsheet of documents
22 22 misc Declaration Fri 03/27 6:40 PM
DECLARATION of Ariel Kumpinsky re Notice (Other),18 in support of Amended Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc..(Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, pgs 7-9,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, pgs 10
21 21 misc Declaration Fri 03/27 6:35 PM
DECLARATION of Diana Rodriguez re Notice (Other),18 in support of Amended Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc..(Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, pg 4,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, pgs 5 to 15
20 20 misc For Judicial Notice Fri 03/27 6:31 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of Amended Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc.. (Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Declaration Fri 03/27 6:24 PM
DECLARATION of Sage Stone re Notice (Other),18 in support of Amended Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc.. (Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/27 6:20 PM
NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION filed by defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc.. (erroneously sued as Samuel, Son and Co, Inc.)(Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit I, pgs 38 to 39, Judge Sykes signed 02 27 2020 Order of Dismissal of Sierra Aluminum Company,
Att: 2 Exhibit J, pgs 40 to 299, Notice to Adverse Party and Clerk of Superior Court,
Att: 3 Exhibit K, pgs 300 to 331, Fed and State Ct. verdicts and settlements
Monday, March 16, 2020
17 17 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 03/16 4:08 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Related Case(s) Mon 03/16 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc.. AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83.1.3.1 Related Case(s): 5:20-cv-00509 SVW (SPx) (Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
15 15 notice Appearance Fri 03/13 4:33 PM
Corrected NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jackland K Hom on behalf of Plaintiff Ron Ramirez (Hom, Jackland)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 03/13 2:04 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document submitted in the wrong case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Supplement Fri 03/13 10:42 AM
SUPPLEMENT filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc.. (Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/12 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Riverside Superior Court's Filed February 27, 2020 Order Dismissing Defendant Sierra Aluminum Company Without Prejudice filed by defendants Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc., Sierra Aluminum Company.(Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, pgs 2 to 3, Request and Order for Dismissal of Defendant Sierra Aluminum Company Without Prejudice
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/11 3:45 PM
NOTICE filed by Defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc.. NOTICE OF STANDING ORDER (Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appearance Wed 03/11 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jackland K Hom on behalf of Plaintiff Ron Ramirez (Attorney Jackland K Hom added to party Ron Ramirez(pty:pla))(Hom, Jackland)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 03/10 3:14 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2020
8 8 notice Appearance Mon 03/09 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey Scott Herman on behalf of Plaintiff Ron Ramirez (Attorney Jeffrey Scott Herman added to party Ron Ramirez(pty:pla))(Herman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2020
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/03 6:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/03 6:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 03/03 5:50 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Sierra Aluminum Company, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Ron Ramirez. (filed in state court 11/12/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/02 7:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Samuel, Son & Co. (USA) Inc..(Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher Decker ISO notice of removal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Diana Rodriguez ISO notice of removal,
Att: 3 Declaration of Ariel Kumpinsky ISO notice of removal,
Att: 4 Declaration of Cecile Chung ISO notice of removal,
Att: 5 Declaration of Sage Stone ISO notice of removal
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/02 7:13 PM
NOTICE of Consent to and Joinder in Removal Filed by Defendant Samuel, Son & Co. (USA) Inc. filed by Defendant Samuel, Son & Co. (USA) Inc.. (Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Related Case(s) Mon 03/02 7:08 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Samuel, Son & Co. (USA) Inc.. (Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/02 7:04 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Samuel, Son & Co. (USA) Inc., (Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/02 6:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC1905626 Receipt No: ACACDC-25580204 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Samuel, Son & Co. (USA) Inc.. (Attorney Sage Stone added to party Samuel, Son & Co. (USA) Inc.(pty:dft))(Stone, Sage)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Proof of Service of First Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Ownership,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Amendment to Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit F -Answer of Sierra Aluminum Company's to First Amended Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Request for Dismissal & Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Samuel, Son & Co. (USA), Inc.'s answer to First Amended Complaint
othcmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/03 5:55 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Sierra Aluminum Company, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Ron Ramirez (filed in state court 12/16/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/03 5:58 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Ron Ramirez, upon Defendant Sierra Aluminum Company served on 12/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 12/24/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/03 6:00 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Sierra Aluminum Company. (filed in state court 2/5/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 6)(esa)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/03 6:05 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Samuel, Son and Co. (USA), Inc. (filed in state court 2/28/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 8)(esa)
Related: [-]