Indiana Southern District Court
Case #: 3:20-cr-00011
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 04, 2020 2:41 AM EST
Defendant
JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1)
Represented By
Michael C. Keating
Law Offices Of Steven K. Deig, LLC
contact info
Miscellaneous
USM (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Todd Stanton Shellenbarger
United States Attorney'S Office (evansville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/04/2020 2:54 AM EST
Friday, July 05, 2019
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT & AFFIDAVIT approved and signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). Electronic Notice to USM-W. (TMD) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Todd Stanton Shellenbarger appearing for USA. (TMD) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
4 4 PENALTY SHEET as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). (TMD) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
5 5 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY***SCHEDULING ORDER as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1) Initial Appearance set for 9/3/2019 at 11:30 AM (Central Time) in room #301, United States Courthouse, 101 Northwest MLK Boulevard, Evansville, Indiana before Judge Richard L. Young. Electronic Notice to USPO.(TMB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
6 6 COURTROOM MINUTES for initial appearance held 9/03/2019 before Judge Richard L. Young. Defendant JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1) appears in person and submits a financial affidavit which is approved. Michael Keating is appointed as CJA counsel. Appearance for the USA by AUSA Todd Shellenbarger. USPO represented by Zack Marlin. Charges, Rights and Penalties explained. Defendant signed Waiver of Preliminary Hearing in open court. By agreement, the parties request release of the pretrial services report, and there being no cause, the court grants the request. USA requests detention. A Detention Hearing is set for 9/5/2019 at 11:30 AM in room #301, United States Courthouse, 101 Northwest MLK Boulevard, Evansville, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Defendant is remanded to custody of USM. (Court Reporter Maggie Techert) Electronic Notice to USPO.(TMD) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (TMB). [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). (TMD) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order Appointing CJA Counsel Michael Keating as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). Such appointment shall be deemed effective as of 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/3/2019. (TMD) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
11 11 MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1).(Shellenbarger, Todd) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 Arrest Warrant Returned by US Marshal. Service of Warrant EXECUTED on 9/3/2019 in case as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). Electronic Notice to USM-W.(TMB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER granting11 Motion to Unseal Case as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/5/2019.(TMB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
14 14 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Detention Hearing as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1) held on 9/5/2019. The government appears by AUSA Todd Shellenbarger. The defendant appears in person and with Counsel Michael Keating. The United States Probation Office is represented by Zack Marlin. The parties acknowledge receipt of the Pretrial Services Report. The Court takes notice of the Pretrial Services Report and the Criminal Complaint and Affidavit. The detention hearing is conducted. The government offers Exhibit 1- IDOC Offender Data Report as evidence. Defense counsel calls defendant Justin Ryan Baden to testify. He is sworn and examined. Arguments are made. The Court finds defendant would be a danger to the community if released, and orders defendant detained pending trial. A separate order of detention to be entered. The defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court is adjourned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF DETENTION Pending Trial as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/5/2019. (TMB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
16 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael C. Keating appearing for JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1) (CJA Appointment). (Keating, Michael) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION to Revoke or Amendment of the Detention Order by JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). (Keating, Michael) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
18 18 SCHEDULING ORDER as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). This matter is before the Court on Defendant Justin Ryan Baden's Motion for Revocation or Amendment of the Detention Order, filed on September 6, 2019. (Docket No.17 ). The Court hereby sets a Motion Hearing for 10/4/2019 at 01:30 PM (Central Time) in room #301, United States Courthouse, 101 Northwest MLK Boulevard, Evansville, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/26/2019. Electronic Notice to USPO.(TMB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
19 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to January 3, 2020 in which to indict by USA as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1).(Shellenbarger, Todd) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 07, 2019
20 20 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Motion Hearing as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1) held on 10/4/2019 re17 MOTION to Revoke or Amendment of the Detention Order filed by JUSTIN RYAN BADEN. The government appears by AUSA Todd Shellenbarger. The defendant appears in person and with Counsel Michael Keating. The United States Probation Office is represented by Zack Marlin. The Court takes note of the Addendum to the Pretrial Services Report and after consideration, the Court revokes its previous Order of Detention and orders the defendant released under certain conditions. A separate Order Setting Conditions of Release to be entered. The defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending release. Court is adjourned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Electronic Notice to USPO.(TMB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/4/2019. Electronic Notice to USM-C.(TMB) Modified text on 10/7/2019 (TMB). [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment to 1/3/20 as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/7/2019.(JRB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2019
23 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 2, 2020 in which to indict by USA as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1).(Shellenbarger, Todd) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2019
24 24 ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time for Indictment to 4/2/20 as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/12/2019.(JRB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
28 28 Arrest Warrant Returned by US Marshal. Service of Warrant EXECUTED on 2/20/2020 in case as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). Electronic Notice to USM-W.(AAS) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
29 29 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Initial Hearing re 25 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1) held on 2/24/2020. The government appears by AUSA Todd Shellenbarger. The defendant appears in person and by Counsel, Michael Keating. The United States Probation Office appears by Katrina Sanders. The Court reads the alleged violation. The defendant acknowledges he understands the allegation and admits to violation. The Court revokes its previous Order Setting Conditions of Release and Orders defendant detained pending trial. The defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court is adjourned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) [3:19-mj-00076-MPB]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
30 30 INFORMATION FILED FELONY as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1) count(s) 1. Electronic notice to USM-W. (AAS)
Related: [-]
31 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Todd Stanton Shellenbarger appearing for USA. (AAS)
Related: [-]
32 32 PETITION TO ENTER PLEA OF GUILTY AND PLEA AGREEMENT as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). (AAS)
Related: [-]
36 36 PENALTY SHEET as to JUSTIN RYAN BADEN (1). (AAS)
Related: [-]