California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Jay C Gandhi
Case #: 2:14-cv-02850
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2014
Terminated:Nov 24, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 21, 2015 3:00 AM PST
Defendant
John DeSimone
Represented By
Sarah L Kushner
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Daniel S Floyd
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Richard Goudis
Represented By
Sarah L Kushner
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Daniel S Floyd
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Herbalife Ltd.
Represented By
Sarah L Kushner
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Daniel S Floyd
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael O. Johnson
Represented By
Sarah L Kushner
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Daniel S Floyd
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Desmond Walsh
Represented By
Sarah L Kushner
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Daniel S Floyd
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Dickey
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Movant
City of Atlanta Firefighters' Pension Fund
Represented By
Maya Saxena
Saxena White PA
contact info
Jon A Tostrud
Tostrud Law Group PC
contact info
Movant
Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
Represented By
Maya Saxena
Saxena White PA
contact info
Jon A Tostrud
Tostrud Law Group PC
contact info
Lester R Hooker
Saxena White PA
contact info
Movant
Davin Pokoik
Represented By
Michael M Goldberg
Glancy Binkow And Goldberg LLP
contact info
Movant
Karen Richardson
Represented By
Michael M Goldberg
Glancy Binkow And Goldberg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Abdul Awad
Represented By
Michael M Goldberg
Glancy Binkow And Goldberg LLP
contact info
Jeremy A Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Francis P McConville
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Lionel Zevi Glancy
Glancy Binkow And Goldberg LLP
contact info
Robert Vincent Prongay
Glancy Binkow And Goldberg LLP
contact info
Patrick V Dahlstrom
Pomerantz LLP
contact info


1. Herbalife wins dismissal of U.S. 'pyramid scheme' lawsuit (reuters.com)
Submitted Wed 03/18/2015
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
131 131 judgmentCV Judgment Tue 11/24 2:39 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, in favor of Herbalife Ltd., Michael O. Johnson against Abdul Awad. The Court having dismissed Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff take nothing, that the action be dismissed with prejudice, and that Defendants recover their costs of suit pursuant to a bill of costs filed in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1920. Related to: Order on Motion to Dismiss130 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2015
130 130 order Dismiss Tue 11/24 2:20 PM
MEMORANDUM (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting120 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint with prejudice. (See order for details). (shb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2015
129 129 transcript Transcript Order Form (G-120) Thu 11/19 3:41 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Herbalife Ltd. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Iris Newman at inewman@gibsondunn.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Mircheff, Alexander)
Related: [-]
128 128 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Thu 11/19 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings November 9, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. re Transcript127 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Cuneo, Patricia)
Related: [-]
127 127 transcript Transcript Thu 11/19 11:26 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on November 9, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO CSR 1600, OFFICIAL REPORTER, website www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2016. (Cuneo, Patricia)
Related: [-]