Fairfield, City of, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45089 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:20-cv-00202 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 24, 2020 4:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Fairfield, City of, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/24/2020 4:09 PM EDT |
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3536338. related document1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fairfield, City of, Alabama.(KEK). (Sutton, William) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | ||
1 | 1 154 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fairfield, City of, Alabama.(KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
2 | 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Fairfield, City of, Alabama. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Fairfield, City of, Alabama. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Sent via certified mail. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fairfield, City of, Alabama. Actavis Pharma Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Ohio Northern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Ohio Northern. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 2:20-cv-00202. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |