Pell City, Alabama, City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45091 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 4:20-cv-00203 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 24, 2020 4:33 PM EDT |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Pell City, Alabama, City of
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/24/2020 4:32 PM EDT |
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3536315. related document1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pell City, Alabama, City of.(MRR, ). (Sutton, William) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | ||
1 | 1 156 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pell City, Alabama, City of.(MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
2 | 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Pell City, Alabama, City of. (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Pell City, Alabama, City of (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Noramco Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
7 | 7 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
8 | 8 Summons Issued as to Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Actavis Pharma Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern Ohio for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk sent to Clerk of Court in District of Northern Ohio. (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 3/4/2020.] | |
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 4:20-cv-00203. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |