Facebook Incorporated et al v. Namecheap Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | G Murray Snow |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-00470 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 31, 2020 4:03 AM MST |
Defendant
Namecheap Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Whoisguard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Facebook Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Instagram LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WhatsApp Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
197 | 197
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 04/25 8:55 AM
ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation196 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing this action, including all claims and counterclaims, with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/25/2022. (REK) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2022 | ||
196 | 196
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 04/22 6:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Incorporated, WhatsApp LLC. (Barker, David) |
|
195 | 195
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/22 9:40 AM
ORDER that Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Transfer Domain Namesto Plaintiffs (Doc.192 ) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that all domain names at issue in this case are RELEASED from the Court's control and authority, pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1125(d)(2)(D)(i)(I). FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Namecheap, Inc. will take all necessary steps to transfer the domain names listed in Appendix A to Plaintiffs. See order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 4/22/22. (NKS) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
194 | 194
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/21 8:15 PM
NOTICE re: Non-Opposition by Namecheap Incorporated, Whoisguard Incorporated re:192 MOTION -- UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER DOMAIN NAMES TO PLAINTIFFS . (Dahlberg, Brianna) |
|
193 | 193
misc
Amended Doc (NOT Motion/Complaint/Cross/Counter/3rd Party Claim)
Thu 04/21 7:33 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Incorporated, WhatsApp LLC. Amendment to192 MOTION -- UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER DOMAIN NAMES TO PLAINTIFFS Amended Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Transfer Domain Names to Plaintiffs . (Jones, Jacob) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
192 | 192
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/20 6:05 PM
MOTION -- UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER DOMAIN NAMES TO PLAINTIFFS by Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Incorporated, WhatsApp LLC.(Barker, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order and Ex. 1 |