Case Filed:Apr 15, 2014
Terminated:Oct 01, 2014

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:32 AM EDT
Thursday, September 26, 2013
1 1 ** SEALED ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Robert Sherman.(mh) (Emailed to FPD) [1:13-mj-00116-JSK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter to Judge Kaull
Tuesday, October 01, 2013
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Brian J. Kornbrath for Robert Sherman appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 10/1/2013. (emailed to USA, counsel for defendant, USM,USP,FPD, defendant via US mail) (jmm) [1:13-mj-00116-JSK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2014
Case unsealed as to Robert Sherman. (jmm) [1:13-mj-00116-JSK]
Related: [-]
3 3 INFORMATION as to Robert Sherman (1) count(s) 1. (USM,USP via email)(jmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 unexecuted waiver of Indictment