North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Conrad, Jr
Case #: 3:20-cv-00148
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2020
Terminated:Oct 12, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 02, 2020 4:55 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
David Newman
Represented By
Robb Adam Longman
Longman & Van Grack, LLC
contact info
Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Fitzgerald Litigation
contact info
Counter Claimant
Penny Newman
Represented By
Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Fitzgerald Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant
David Newman
Represented By
Robb Adam Longman
Longman & Van Grack, LLC
contact info
Tyler A. Rhoades
Redding Jones, PLLC
contact info
Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Fitzgerald Litigation
contact info
David G. Redding
Redding Jones, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Penny Newman
Represented By
Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Fitzgerald Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Mary Rouser
Defendant
John Steinbach
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Emily Katherine Miller
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Kyle Lamar Bishop
U.S. Dept. Of Justice, Tax Division
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Defendant
United States of America
Terminated: 06/15/2020
Represented By
Emily Katherine Miller
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Kyle Lamar Bishop
U.S. Dept. Of Justice, Tax Division
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, November 24, 2023
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/24 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Name and Email Address Change by United States of America (Miller, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/05 12:31 PM
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Robb Adam Longman, Longman & Van Grack, LLC, and David G. Redding shall be removed as counsel of record for Defendants David Newman and Penny Newman. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 4/5/2022. (ams)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
31 31 motion Withdraw Tue 03/22 3:47 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Robb Longman and David Reddind by David Newman, Penny Newman. (Longman, Robb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
30 30 5 pgs order Order Tue 10/12 2:33 PM
CONSENT ORDER OF INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/12/2021. (brl)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Tue 10/12 2:32 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUCTION. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/12/2021. (brl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
28 28 motion Approve Consent Judgment Thu 10/07 3:43 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Order of Injunction by United States of America. Responses due by 10/21/2021 (Miller, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Consent Judgment,
Att: 2 Proposed Order of Injunction
Monday, September 20, 2021
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 09/20 3:01 PM
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, John Steinbach, and Mary Rouser. JUDGMENT is entered as to Counts III and V in favor of the United States and against Defendants John Steinbach, Mary Rouser, and Wells Fargo, N.A. Defendants John Steinbach, Mary Rouser, and Wells Fargo, N.A., have no interest in the subject real property, and if the property is sold, Defendants John Steinbach, Mary Rouser, and Wells Fargo, N.A, shall take nothing from the sale of that realproperty. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/20/2021. (brl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/12 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robb Adam Longman on behalf of Penny Newman (Longman, Robb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/09 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Penny Newman (Longman, Robb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/10 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Allen Bunda on behalf of ABS Loan Trust VI (Bunda, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/05 11:31 AM
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/05 11:52 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaims. The motion is moot as to the Counterclaims brought by David Newman. United States of America shall answer the Counterclaims brought by Penny Newman by 4/9/2021. Entered by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/5/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/25 7:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. ABS Loan Trust VI served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Miller, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
22 22 service Summons Issued Tue 01/19 1:44 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to ABS Loan Trust VI. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 01/13 3:38 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting the United States' 7 Motion to Substitute Party. ABS Loan Trust VI added. Bank of America, N.A. terminated. Entered by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/13/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
21 21 motion Default Judgment Tue 11/03 8:41 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, John Steinbach, and Mary Rouser by United States of America. (Miller, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Emily K. Miller,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - John Steinbach SCRA.,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Mary Rouser SCRA.,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 08/05 11:28 AM
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew L. Fitzgerald terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Penny Newman. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/5/2020. (brl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 07/09 12:21 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Penny Newman. Responses due by 7/23/2020(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, July 06, 2020
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 07/06 4:08 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion is granted as to David Newman, and Andrew L. Fitzgerald and Fitzgerald Litigation shall be removed as counsel of record for Defendant David Newman. The motion is denied without prejudice as to Defendant Penny Newman. Mr. Fitzgerald may file a motion to withdraw as counsel for Penny Newman that either is accompanied by Penny Newmans written consent or otherwise shows good cause for withdrawal. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/6/2020. (brl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/17 2:26 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robb A. Longman for David Newman. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 6/16/2020. (brl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Wed 06/17 2:26 PM
Notice to Robb A. Longman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at[LINK:www.ncwd.uscourts.gov] . Deadline by 6/24/2020. (brl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/10 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Counterclaims by David Newman (Rhoades, Tyler)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/10 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler A. Rhoades on behalf of David Newman (Rhoades, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 06/09 10:04 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (clc)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 06/09 10:03 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mary Rouser. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (clc)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 06/09 9:56 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to John Steinbach. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (clc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Fri 06/05 2:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robb A. Longman Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4520407. by David Newman. Related [+]
Related: [-] dding, David
Thursday, June 04, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/04 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Redding on behalf of David Newman Related [+]
Related: [-] dding, David
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
9 9 motion Entry of Default Tue 06/02 11:39 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants Wells Fargo, Mary Rouser, and John Steinbach by United States of America.(Miller, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Nimra Khan,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - USPS Tracking Report,
Att: 4 Proposed Order as to Wells Fargo,
Att: 5 Proposed Order as to Mary Rouser,
Att: 6 Proposed Order as to John Steinbach
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
8 8 motion Extension of Time Wed 05/06 4:26 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by United States of America. (Bishop, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 04, 2020
7 7 motion Substitute Party Mon 05/04 1:02 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by United States of America. Responses due by 5/18/2020(Miller, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Deed of Trust,
Att: 3 Notice of Hearing Pursuant to Rule 25(a)(3),
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
6 6 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/14 3:14 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David Newman, Penny Newman. Responses due by 4/28/2020(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, March 13, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 03/13 3:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America by Penny Newman, David Newman.(Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/13 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Fitzgerald on behalf of David Newman, Penny Newman (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 03/06 3:21 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 .(brl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - Penny Newman,
Att: 2 Summons - Bank of America,
Att: 3 Summons - John Steinbach,
Att: 4 Summons - Mary Rouser,
Att: 5 Summons - Wells Fargo
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/06 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Lamar Bishop on behalf of United States of America (Bishop, Kyle)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/06 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT for Federal Taxes and Foreclosure of Liens against All Defendants, filed by United States of America.(Miller, Emily)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/06 3:06 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (brl)
Related: [-]