Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Carlos E Mendoza
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:20-cv-00408
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2020
Terminated:Apr 29, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 02, 2020 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael A. Packer
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Plaintiff
Nationwide General Contracting, LLC
Represented By
Nelson Alejandro Perez
Hl Law Group
contact info
Harold Y. Levy
Hl Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 01, 2020
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Fri 05/01 1:11 PM
ORDER denying 16 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/1/2020. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
18 18 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Wed 04/29 3:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Nationwide General Contracting, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Nationwide General Contracting, LLC, Other Affiliate Nelson Perez, Other Affiliate Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin PC, Other Affiliate DDA CLAIMS MANAGEMENT, Other Affiliate Harold Y. Levy, Other Affiliate Edgard de Olazabal, Other Affiliate Joe Persaud as authorized signatory for Palm Tree Packaging, Inc., Other Affiliate Palm Tree Packaging, Inc., Other Affiliate David Matheson, Other Affiliate Corporate Representative, on behalf of Hartford, Other Affiliate Donan Engineering Co., Inc, Other Affiliate Alexis Rosado, Other Affiliate Andrew Jaffe for Nationwide General Contracting, LLC.. (Perez, Nelson)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Wed 04/29 2:20 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nationwide General Contracting, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Perez, Nelson)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Reopen Case Wed 04/29 2:13 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Nationwide General Contracting, LLC. (Perez, Nelson)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order dismissing case Wed 04/29 10:56 AM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/29/2020. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
14 14 notice Notice to counsel of Local Rule Tue 04/21 8:31 AM
NOTICE to counsel Andrew B. Jaffe of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2020
13 13 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Mon 04/20 5:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Ins. Corp. for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Packer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Wed 03/18 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nelson Alejandro Perez on behalf of Nationwide General Contracting, LLC (Perez, Nelson)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
11 11 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 03/16 4:23 PM
Amended NOTICE OF REMOVAL re1 Notice of Removal by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Packer, Michael) Modified to correct docket text on 3/16/2020 (SPM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A and B
10 10 order *Order no pdf Mon 03/16 10:43 AM
ENDORSED ORDER discharging 8 Order to Show Cause. On or before March 23, 2020, Defendant shall file its Amended Petition for Removal as a separate docket entry. Failure to do so may result in the remand of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/16/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Response to order to show cause Mon 03/16 9:21 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re8 Order to show cause filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Packer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Petition for Removal with Exhibits
Thursday, March 12, 2020
8 8 2 pgs order Order to show cause Thu 03/12 3:46 PM
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as to Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Show Cause Response due by 3/19/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/12/2020. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/10 12:00 PM
STANDING ORDER on Discovery motions. ctp Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2020
6 6 order *Order no pdf Mon 03/09 3:23 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/9/2020. (MEH)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Interested persons order Mon 03/09 3:23 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/9/2020. (MEH)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Related case order and track 2 notice Mon 03/09 3:20 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/23/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/9/2020. (MEH)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to counsel of Local Rule Mon 03/09 10:20 AM
NOTICE to counsel Andrew Bernard Jaffe of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DMA) (copies mailed)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/06 4:29 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-408-Orl-41EJK. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/06 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2020-CA-1206 filed in State Court on 1/31/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16565189 filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.(Packer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Notice of Service of Process and Summons,
Att: 3 State Court ANSWER State-Answer,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 State Court Docket Sheet State-Docket,
Att: 6 State Court Pending Motions State-Plaintiff's Request for Admissions to Defendant,
Att: 7 State Court Pending Motions State-Plaintiff's Request for Production to Defendant,
Att: 8 State Court Pending Motions State-Plaintiff's Interrogatories to,
Att: 9 State Court Pending Motions State Defendant's Request for Admissions to Plaintifff,
Att: 10 State Court Pending Motions State-Defendant's Request for Production to Plaintiff,
Att: 11 State Court Pending Motions State-Defendant's Interrogatories to Plaintiff,
Att: 12 State Court Other Documents State-Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Deposition Requests