Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 2:08-bk-12687
Case Filed:May 02, 2008
Dismissed:Jan 11, 2012
Terminated:Sep 18, 2012
Accountant
Dawson & Gerbic
Creditor
United Commercial Bank
Debtor
Auburn Ace Holdings LLC
Interested Party
Ben Errez
Interested Party
Plan B Development LLC
Realtor
CMN Inc
Realtor
Robert Green
Spec. Counsel
Young deNormandie
Special Request
Centrum Financial Services
Special Request
Centrum Financial Services Inc
Special Request
Centurion Financial Services Inc
Special Request
Plan B Development LLC
Special Request
Wells Fargo Bank NA
Special Request
Young de Normandie
US Trustee
United States Trustee

GPO Aug 28 2008
Memorandum Decision On Motion For Reconsideration Signed on 8/28/2008 (Related document(s) 164 Motion to Reconsider). (USBC Staff - Stone, Dorna)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.