New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:20-cv-01260
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2020
Terminated:Jan 13, 2021
Last checked: Friday Sep 04, 2020 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Asplundh Construction Corp.
Represented By
Steven H Sewell
contact info
David S. Feather
Feather Law Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Frank Ehrenfeld
Represented By
Steven H Sewell
contact info
David S. Feather
Feather Law Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Lloyd Jones
Represented By
Steven H Sewell
contact info
David S. Feather
Feather Law Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Asplundh Construction LLC
Represented By
Steven H Sewell
contact info
David S. Feather
Feather Law Firm, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert DePaola
9 Francis Street
Nesconset, NY 11767
Represented By
Tiffany Ma
Young & Ma LLP
contact info
William M. Brown
Brown Kwon & Lam, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
54 54 misc Letter Wed 07/05 10:45 AM
Letter Motion to Withdraw Application to Reopen by Robert DePaola (Mishkin, Scott)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Wed 07/05 12:10 PM
ORDER withdrawing52 Motion to Reopen Case; withdrawing53 Motion to Reopen Case. See DE 54. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/5/2023. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 02, 2023
53 53 motion Reopen Case Sun 07/02 3:18 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Asplundh Construction Corp., Asplundh Construction LLC, Frank Ehrenfeld, Lloyd Jones. (Sewell, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
52 52 motion Reopen Case Thu 06/29 4:52 PM
Letter Application to Re-Open by Robert DePaola (Mishkin, Scott) Modified on 6/29/2023- modified event type from Letter to Motion to Reopen Case. (GO)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Thu 06/29 5:06 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/29/2023. (KD)
Related: [-]