Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Jodi W Dishman
Case #: 5:20-cv-00210
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2020
Terminated:Apr 08, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Sep 05, 2020 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Yolanda Cezar
Represented By
James G Evans
Louisiana Dept Of Justice
contact info
Kindanne C Jones
contact info
Jacqueline B Wilson
Louisiana Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Richard C Passler
Represented By
James G Evans
Louisiana Dept Of Justice
contact info
Kindanne C Jones
contact info
Jacqueline B Wilson
Louisiana Dept Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board
Represented By
James G Evans
Louisiana Dept Of Justice
contact info
Kindanne C Jones
contact info
Jacqueline B Wilson
Louisiana Dept Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Sanford Kutner
216 Davis Drive
Luling, LA 70070
Represented By
Sanford A Kutner
Law Offices Of Sandy Kutner
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Louisiana State Bar Association
Terminated: 08/03/2020


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, April 08, 2021
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/08 9:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler.(Evans, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A - E-mails
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
27 27 misc Joint Status Report Tue 02/23 2:31 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Defendants Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler.(Evans, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - October 13, 2020 Hearing Committee Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - December 22, 2020 Louisiana Supreme Court Order
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
26 26 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/09 3:18 PM
ORDER. The Court finds that a status update as to the state proceedings related to Mr. Kutner's claims is necessary to effectively evaluate whether abstention is appropriate. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to file a brief joint status report within fourteen (14) days advising the Court as to the current status of any state proceedings that are related to Mr. Kutner's claims. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 2/9/2021. (nv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
25 25 2 pgs notice Notice of Related or Companion Case Tue 10/13 5:05 PM
NOTICE TO COURT by Sanford Kutner (Kutner, Sanford) Modified on 10/13/2020 to correct docket text to match title of filing document (nv).
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
24 24 2 pgs motion Amend/Correct Fri 10/09 11:40 AM
STRICKEN FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Original Complaint by Sanford Kutner.(Kutner, Sanford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit writ app,
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit body of filing
notice Notice from the Court Fri 10/09 1:27 PM
NOTICE from the Court24 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Original Complaint , STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with LCvR15.1. Specifically, "The motion shall state: (1) the deadline date established by the scheduling order, if any, and, (2) whether any other party objects to the motion." Counsel to refile. (nv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
23 23 3 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/06 3:32 PM
STRICKEN AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sanford Kutner.(Kutner, Sanford)
Related: [-]
notice Notice from the Court Tue 10/06 3:48 PM
NOTICE from the Court23 Amended Complaint, STRICKEN due to incorrect filing event used. The document appears to be a motion not an Amended Complaint. Counsel directed to refile consistent with LCvR15.1 and is also directed to include a certificate of service. (nv)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
22 22 respm Reply Mon 08/31 3:50 PM
REPLY by Defendants Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler re21 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler. (Evans, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2020
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/24 12:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sanford Kutner. (Kutner, Sanford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
20 20 motion Dismiss Tue 08/11 4:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler.(Wilson, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - La Supreme Court Rule XIX, Excerpts,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - La Hearing Committee Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - LADB Adjudicative Committee Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 -Lawsuit Mailed to LADB,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Lawsuit Mailed to Passler
19 19 motion Dismiss Tue 08/11 6:30 AM
STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss by Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler.(Wilson, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5
notice Notice from the Court Tue 08/11 11:27 AM
NOTICE from the Court19 MOTION to Dismiss , STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with this Court's CM-ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(A)(4)(a). Specifically, lack of descriptions of exhibits. (nv)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2020
18 18 notice ~Notice (other) Mon 08/03 5:23 PM
NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Plaintiff's Notice and Motion of Dismissal of Louisiana State Bar Association as a Defendant Doc. No.15 operates on its own terms as a voluntary dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Louisiana State Bar Association, without any action or order required by the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); see also De Leon v. Marcos, 659 F.3d 1276, 1283 (10th Cir. 2011) ("stipulation of dismissal filed under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) or (ii) is self-executing"). IT IS SO NOTED this 3rd day of August 2020.(nv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
17 17 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 07/30 1:06 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by James G Evans on behalf of Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler (Evans, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 07/30 12:25 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jacqueline B Wilson on behalf of Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler (Wilson, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
15 15 2 pgs motion Dismiss Wed 07/29 7:59 PM
FIRST MOTION to Dismiss LOUISIANA STATE BAR ASSOCIATION AS A DEFENDANT by Sanford Kutner. (Kutner, Sanford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/28 1:34 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, provided each counsel, as instructed by LCvR83.2(g), submits an ECF registration form and, upon activation, electronically files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Counsel must follow the local rules of this Court, including but not limited to immediate disclosures to the Court of any suspension, disbarment, or resignation that triggers the application of LCvR83.6(a). Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 07/28/2020. (nv)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Receipt Tue 07/28 11:12 AM
Receipt for Money Received in the amount of $100.00, receipt number OKW500081206 regarding12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected) Louisiana AAG Jacqueline Wilson ,10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Louisiana Assistant Attorney General James Evans (knt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Wed 07/22 12:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected) Louisiana AAG Jacqueline Wilson by Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler.(Jones, Kindanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Application for PHV
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Wed 07/22 12:23 PM
STRICKEN MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Louisiana Assistant Attorney General Jacqueline Wilson by Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler.(Jones, Kindanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Application for PHV
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Wed 07/22 12:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Louisiana Assistant Attorney General James Evans by Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler.(Jones, Kindanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Application for PHV
9 9 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 07/22 12:18 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kindanne C Jones on behalf of Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Disciplinary Board, Richard C Passler (Jones, Kindanne)
Related: [-]
notice Notice from the Court Wed 07/22 5:00 PM
NOTICE from the Court11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Louisiana Assistant Attorney General Jacqueline Wilson , STRICKEN due to an amended version being filed as Doc. No.12 . (nv)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
notice ~Notice (other) Mon 07/20 9:54 PM
IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at[LINK:http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information] .****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555. (Pigott, William) (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 07/01 4:05 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Yolanda Cezar, Richard C Passler. (em)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 05/12 4:17 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Extend Time for Service. Plaintiff's deadline to effect service of process on Defendants is extended until August 3, 2020. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 05/12/2020. (nv)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
6 6 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/08 3:52 PM
FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve by Sanford Kutner. (Kutner, Sanford)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 03/13 11:29 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Order. See Order for details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 03/13/2020. (nv)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/09 3:45 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Louisiana Attorney Diciplinary Board. (dtb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Receipt Mon 03/09 3:31 PM
Receipt for Money Received from Sanford Kutner in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500078956 regarding1 Complaint (dtb)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs motion Order Mon 03/09 3:27 PM
MOTION for Order by Sanford Kutner.(dtb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Attachment ECF Registration Form
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/09 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Yolanda Cezar, Louisiana Attorney Diciplinary Board, Louisiana State Bar Association, Richard C Passler filed by Sanford Kutner.(dtb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope