Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-04512
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2020
Terminated:Feb 02, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 06, 2020 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ZANE HOLMAN
Represented By
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
2 2 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/02 1:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by ZANE HOLMAN. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/10 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ZANE HOLMAN. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]