Crampton, Trustee v. The Kroger Co.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-05419
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-05419
North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Stephani W Humrickhouse |
Case #: | 5:20-ap-00045 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Mar 11, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
1014 Vine St.
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory B Crampton, Trustee
Nicholls & Crampton, P.A. PO Box 18237
Raleigh, NC 27619 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
crditcrd
none (ADI)
Wed 09/28 2:13 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Payment of AP Fee([LINK 20-00045 5-SWH] ) [admis,payfeeap] ( 350.00), Receipt Number A16940314, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
admis
Pay Fee-AP
Wed 09/28 2:10 PM
Payment of AP Filing Fee in the amount of $350 filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee. (Crampton, Gregory) |
||
Monday, May 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK)
Mon 05/11 9:08 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Gregory B Crampton. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: Service on the Defendant is at an address different than the court records. Upon completion of proper service, a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Due by 5/26/2020. (Crossman, Ahronda) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 05/11 9:10 AM
Adversary Case 5:20-ap-45 Closed (Crossman, Ahronda) |
||
Friday, May 01, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee . (Crampton, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
court
Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK)
Thu 04/30 1:08 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Gregory Crampton. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The Certificate of Service was omitted. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Due by 5/14/2020. (Crossman, Ahronda) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to The Kroger Co. filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B Crampton, Trustee. (Crampton, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, April 22, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/22/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Consent Order in Resolution of Adversary Proceeding. (Crossman, Ahronda) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
court
Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK)
Tue 04/14 3:13 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Gregory Crampton. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The order uploaded is incorrect or illegible. The 3" margin is missing from the top of order. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Due by 4/24/2020. (Crossman, Ahronda) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Consent Order in Resolution of Adversary Proceeding . (Crossman, Ahronda) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Service Executed on The Kroger Co. 3/11/2020. filed by Gregory B Crampton on behalf of Gregory B. Crampton. (Crampton, Gregory) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on The Kroger Co. Answer Due 04/10/2020 (Crampton, Gregory) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-00045 5. Complaint by Gregory B. Crampton against The Kroger Co. (Fee Deferred) (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Crampton, Gregory) |
|
utility
Set Deadline (Private)
Thu 03/12 7:00 AM
Answer due by 04/10/2020 (adi) |