Texas Southern District Court
Judge:George C Hanks, Jr
Case #: 4:20-cv-00912
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 08, 2020 4:31 AM CDT
Conflict Check Party
Quintanan Energy Services, Inc.
Defendant
Landon Mann
18971 Mail Route Rd.
Montgomery, TX 77316
Represented By
Jana Hale Woelfel
Clark Hill Strasburger
contact info
Defendant
REME Technologies, LLC d/b/a ArcoTech Drilling Solutions
211 E. 7th Street, Suite 620
Austin, TX 78701
Defendant
REME, LLC d/b/a LEAM Drilling Services
211 E. 7th Street, Suite 620
Austin, TX 78701
Plaintiff
QES Directional Drilling LLC
11390 FM 830
Willis, TX 77318
Represented By
David Philip Whittlesey
Shearman & Sterling LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/12/2020 1:55 PM CDT
Thursday, March 12, 2020
1 1 25 pgs COMPLAINT against QES Directional Drilling LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24394274) filed by QES Directional Drilling LLC.(Whittlesey, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by QES Directional Drilling LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2020.(Whittlesey, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Proposed Order Granting Expedited Discovery,
Att: 7 Proposed Order Granting TRO Application