Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:20-cv-01034
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2020
Case in other court:District of Columbia, 1:20-cv-00546
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
EI DuPont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
individually and as successor in interest to Ansul Co. One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc.
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Represented By
Jennifer A Simon
Kazmarek Mowrey Cloud Laseter LLP
contact info
Alexandra Harrington Austin
Maynard Nexsen
contact info
Paul A Dominick
Maynard Nexsen PC
contact info
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Plaintiff
CITY OF MILLINGTON
Represented By
Matthew M. Lavin
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Plaintiff
NATIONAL RURAL WATER ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Matthew M. Lavin
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Daikin Industries Ltd
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Solvay Specialty Polymers USA LLC
Terminated: 06/02/2020
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Represented By
Theodore M Grossman
Jones Day
contact info
Rebekah E Blake
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
AGC Inc
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
Terminated: 09/25/2020
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Terminated: 12/07/2020
Defendant
Arkema France SA
Terminated: 09/25/2020
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Terminated: 09/25/2020


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
51 51 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/29 3:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 25, 2025
50 50 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/25 3:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List