Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-20088
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Mar 15, 2020 3:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Alejandro Maujo (1)
Represented By
Frank J. Gaviria
Frank J Gaviria PA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Yisel Valdes
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
William T. Zloch
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/15/2020 4:06 AM EDT
Friday, February 14, 2020
1 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Alejandro Maujo. (yha)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to Alejandro Maujo (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Alejandro Maujo (1) count(s) 1, 2-4, 5; and Forfeiture. (yha) (yha).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/14/2020) Restricted Unredacted Indictment