Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:19-bk-75940

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:20-ap-08045
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2020
Terminated:Dec 22, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee for Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through-Certificates Series 2005-9
Represented By
U.S. Bank National Association
contact info
Defendant
Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
Represented By
Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.
contact info
Defendant
BNC Mortgage Inc., (Its Successors and/or Assigns)
Represented By
BNC Mortgage Inc.
contact info
Defendant
MERS, (Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems)
Represented By
Defendant
Sanford Strenger
Represented By
Sanford Strenger
contact info
Defendant
Evangelia Boudourakis
Represented By
Evangelia Boudourakis
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100, Investor(s) 1-100, The names being fictitious and Uknown to plaintiff
Represented By
John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100, Investor(s) 1-100
contact info
Defendant
Doe Corps 1-100
Represented By
Doe Corps 1-100
contact info
Plaintiff
Cecil Leonard Fogg
432 Holly Place
West Hempstead, NY 11552
Represented By
Cecil Leonard Fogg
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
22 22 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Tue 12/22 3:50 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding as Against Defendants, BNC Mortgage Inc. and Doe Corps 1-100, Investor(s) 1-10; the instant adversary proceeding is void as against BNC Mortgage as having been filed in violation of the automatic stay in the BNC Mortgage bankruptcy case pending in the Southern District of New York (Case No. 09-10137 scc); Signed on 12/22/2020 (rom)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/22 3:53 PM
Adversary Case 8:20-ap-8045 Closed (rom)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
21 21 order Generic Order Fri 07/10 3:06 PM
Order Granting Defendant Motion to Dismiss in its entirety, with prejudice against Evangelia Boudourakis Related [+]. Signed on 7/6/2020 (dnb)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Evangelia Boudourakis
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned AP) Wed 07/01 6:29 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Justin Krell: Adversary Dismissed. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Wed 07/01 6:29 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Justin Krell: Motion Granted; submit order (mtagle)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Evangelia Boudourakis
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Thu 06/18 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 06/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2020
19 19 order Generic Order Mon 06/15 3:59 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint in its entirety with prejudice as to Defendant Sanford Strenger Related [+]. Signed on 6/15/2020 (rom)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Sanford Strenger,9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Sanford Strenger,13 Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment filed by Defendant Sanford Strenger
Friday, June 12, 2020
18 18 motion Dismiss Case Fri 06/12 5:02 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case /Adversary Complaint . Objections to be filed on June 24, 2020 at 4:00 p.m.. Filed by Gayle S. Gerson on behalf of Evangelia Boudourakis. Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Gerson, Gayle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gayle S. Gerson in Support of Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint Against Evangelia Boudourakis
Att: 2 Exhibit 1: Adversary Complaint
Att: 3 Appendix Affidavit of Service
Friday, May 22, 2020
17 17 notice Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Fri 05/22 3:28 PM
Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Filed by Sanford Strenger Related [+].(Strenger, Sanford)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 21, 2020
16 16 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 05/21 4:29 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint in its entirety with prejudice as to Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems "MERS", Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., U.S. Bank National Association Related [+] Signed on 5/21/2020. (rom)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 05/20 2:11 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance: Sanford Strenger, Jim Berg, Garrett Fail, Justin Krell: Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/01/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Wed 05/20 2:12 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Sanford Strenger, Jim Berg, Garrett Fail, Justin Krell: Motion Granted with prejudice; submit order (mtagle)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Sanford Strenger
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Wed 05/20 2:13 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Sanford Strenger, Jim Berg, Garrett Fail, Justin Krell: Motion Granted ; submit order (mtagle)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Adversary Proceeding filed by MERS, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., U.S. Bank National Association
Monday, May 18, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Mon 05/18 4:56 PM
Certificate of No Objection with Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Filed by James P. Berg on behalf of MERS, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., U.S. Bank National Association Related [+] (Berg, James) Modified on 5/19/2020 (rom)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association, Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., Defendant MERS
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Declaration of Service
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/13 4:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Justin Slade Krell on behalf of Evangelia Boudourakis (Krell, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Wed 04/15 5:00 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/20/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, April 14, 2020
13 13 notice Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment (use to correct date, time or location of a presentment / heari Tue 04/14 1:03 PM
Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment Filed by Sanford Strenger. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2020 at 09:30 AM (check with court for location).(Strenger, Sanford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
12 12 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 04/14 12:56 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Sanford Strenger on behalf of Sanford Strenger Related [+] (Strenger, Sanford)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Sanford Strenger
Monday, April 13, 2020
11 11 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/13 4:29 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by James P. Berg on behalf of MERS, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Berg, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration in supoort of Motion to Dismiss
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Note and Mortgage
Att: 3 Exhibit B - First Assignment
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex C - Second Assignment
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Modification
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Filed Summons and Complaint
Att: 7 Exhibit F- Affidavits of Service
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Answer, Cecil Fogg
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Answer - Perry Fogg
Att: 10 Exhibit I - NOR Complete - Cecil Fogg
Att: 11 Exhibit J - NOR Complete Perry Fogg
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Order of Reference
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Chase Affidavit
Att: 14 Exhibit M - Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale
Att: 15 Exhibit N - Proposed Bankruptcy Plan
Att: 16 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 09, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/09 4:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sanford Strenger on behalf of Sanford Strenger (Strenger, Sanford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 04/09 3:53 PM
Attorney to refile to correct entry, Certificate of service: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Sanford Strenger on behalf of Sanford Strenger. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Strenger, Sanford) Modified on 4/10/2020 (mtt)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 04/09 3:50 PM
First Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Sanford Strenger on behalf of Sanford Strenger. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Strenger, Sanford) Modified on 4/10/2020 attorney to notify parties of hearing time is 9:30 a.m. (mtt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Sanford Strenger
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Order of Reference
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Complaint & Affidavit
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Judgement of Foreclosure
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Letter of March 18 to Fogg
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/01 3:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James P. Berg on behalf of MERS, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (Berg, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service
Monday, March 16, 2020
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 03/16 3:55 PM
Summons Served on BNC Mortgage Inc. 3/16/2020; Evangelia Boudourakis 3/16/2020; MERS 3/16/2020; Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. 3/16/2020; Sanford Strenger 3/16/2020; U.S. Bank National Association 3/16/2020 . (lkg)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 03/16 2:08 PM
[Entered in Error. Please disregard and see below] Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Cecil Leonard Fogg Related [+] (lkg) Modified on 3/16/2020 (lkg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Cecil Leonard Fogg,2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Sunday, March 15, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Mon 03/16 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 03/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
3 3 court Court's Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/13 2:28 PM
Court's Service Lis Related [+] (one)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Fri 03/13 2:26 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against BNC Mortgage Inc. Answer Due: 4/13/2020; Evangelia Boudourakis Answer Due: 4/13/2020; Doe Corps 1-100 Answer Due: 4/13/2020; John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100, Investor(s) 1-100 Answer Due: 4/13/2020; MERS Answer Due: 4/13/2020; Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. Answer Due: 4/13/2020; Sanford Strenger Answer Due: 4/13/2020; U.S. Bank National Association Answer Due: 4/13/2020 Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (one)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/13 2:18 PM
Adversary case 8 20-08045 Complaint by Cecil Leonard Fogg against U.S. Bank National Association, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc., BNC Mortgage Inc., MERS, Sanford Strenger, Evangelia Boudourakis, John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100, Investor(s) 1-100, Doe Corps 1-100. Receipt Number WAIVED, Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)), (81 (Subordination of claim or interest)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)). (one)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet