California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Edmund F Brennan
Case #: 2:20-cv-00564
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 09, 2020 1:24 AM PDT
Defendant
California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By
Jerome Martin Varanini
Law Offices Of Jerome M. Varanini
contact info
Defendant
Dave Kent
Represented By
Gary Charles Brickwood
Brickwood Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Kameron Lee
Represented By
Gokalp Yusuf Gurer
Angelo, Kilday & Kilduff
contact info
Derick E. Konz
Angelo Kilday & Kilduff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amanda Ream
Defendant
Linda Smith
Defendant
Anderson Fire Protection District
Represented By
Ryan James Matthews
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith
contact info
Joseph A. Salazar, Jr.
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas M. Bosenko
Represented By
Gary Charles Brickwood
Brickwood Law Office
contact info
Defendant
City of Anderson
Represented By
Gokalp Yusuf Gurer
Angelo, Kilday & Kilduff
contact info
Derick E. Konz
Angelo Kilday & Kilduff, LLP
contact info
Defendant
County of Shasta
Represented By
Gary Charles Brickwood
Brickwood Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Steve Lowe
Represented By
Ryan James Matthews
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith
contact info
Joseph A. Salazar, Jr.
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard And Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James I. McMillan
Represented By
James Irwin McMillan
Law Office Of Shawn A. Mcmillan
contact info

GPO Jun 08 2020
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/8/2020 EXTENDING Plaintiff's time limit to serve all Defendants by 45 days, until 7/26/2020. (Huang, H)
GPO Sep 29 2020
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/28/2020 GRANTING 27 the Request to continue motions hearing 24, 25. Defendants' 12(b)(6) hearings are CONTINUED to 10/27/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Plaintiff is to file and serve his Opposition 14 days prior to 10/27/2020.(Reader, L)
GPO Feb 02 2021
#039; responsive pleadings are due 20 days thereafter. (Huang, H)ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/1/2021 GRANTING 24,25 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's 1st and 6th claims for relief are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's 2nd, 3rd, 7th, and 8th claims for relief are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's state law claims for relief (9th, 10th, 12th, 13th, and 14th) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If Plaintiff elects to amend his complaint, he shall file an Amended Complaint within 20 days of this Order. Defendants&
GPO Mar 26 2021
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/25/2021 GRANTING plaintiff until 5/1/2021 to file their Amended Complaint. (Coll, A)
GPO Jun 22 2021
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/21/2021 GRANTING 48 Motion to Continue, CONTINUING the 45 & 46 Motion to Dismiss Hearings to 8/10/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Coll, A)
GPO Oct 27 2021
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/25/21 GRANTING 45 46 Motions to Dismiss. Defendants The City of Anderson, the Anderson Fire Protection District, Fire Chief Steve Lowe, Anderson Police Officer Kameron Lee are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Benson, A.)
GPO Mar 02 2022
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/1/2022 DENYING 59 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's request to add state law claims is likewise DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
GPO Nov 28 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 11/28/2022 MODIFYING the Briefing Schedule on the 79 Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings as follows: Opposition due by 12/22/2022 and Reply due by 01/13/2023. (Spichka, K.)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, November 28, 2022
83 83 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 11/28 12:40 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 11/28/2022 MODIFYING the Briefing Schedule on the79 Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings as follows: Opposition due by 12/22/2022 and Reply due by 01/13/2023. (Spichka, K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
82 82 misc Proposed Order Wed 11/23 11:39 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re extension of time re 80 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing,79 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,81 Stipulation and Proposed Order by James I. McMillan. (McMillan, Shawn)
Related: [-]
81 81 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 11/23 11:37 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time re Minute Order (ECF No. 80) and79 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, by James I. McMillan. (McMillan, Shawn) Modified on 11/23/2022 (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]