Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-01819
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2020
Case in other court:Alabama Northern, 2:20-cv-00131
Last checked: Saturday Sep 12, 2020 5:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company, Inc.
Represented By
Halron W. Turner
Turner, Onderdonk, Kimbrough & Howell
contact info
Plaintiff
James L. Thomas
Represented By
William W Smith
Smith & Alspaugh PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 16, 2020
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 03/16 11:44 AM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00131. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Mon 03/16 11:46 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern, 2 20-0131 Thomas v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 20-1819 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO-193 cc: JPMDL (msrS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
10 10 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL 2741: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern California for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically sent to Clerk of Court in the Northern District of California(MRR, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2020
9 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/9/20. (MRR, )
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) no later than April 23, 2020 . In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after April 23, 2020 . A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:30 a.m. on April 8, 2020 . The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046 . The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 3/9/20. (MRR, )
Related: [-]
7 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company Inc. filed by Monsanto Company Inc (Turner, Halron)
Related: [-]
6 6 ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company Inc.(Turner, Halron)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Monsanto Company Inc served on 2/17/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (MRR, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
4 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2020
3 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
2 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by James L Thomas. (MRR, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company Inc (Filing fee $ 400 B4601103606.), filed by James L Thomas.(MRR, )
Related: [-]