Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:20-cv-01831
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2020
Case in other court:Missouri Eastern, 4:20-cv-00224
Last checked: Saturday Sep 12, 2020 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Joe G. Hollingsworth
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Eric G. Lasker
Hollingsworth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Salyer
Represented By
Martin Daniel Crump
Davis And Crump, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/01 9:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/01 9:34 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/01 9:32 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 03/16 2:25 PM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00224. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Mon 03/16 2:28 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2741, Eastern District of Missouri, 4:20-cv-00224 NCC, Salyer v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-01831 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 193 cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
5 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER (CTO-193) to: Northern District of California. IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. ---Case electronically transferred via CMECF extraction. (MRC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
4 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-193) regarding MDL No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
3 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Donald Salyer Monsanto Company waiver signed on 2/7/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Crump, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
2 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT of Donald Salyer against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7740533, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Donald Salyer.(Crump, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 Waiver of Service
Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)
Related: [-]