Leysen v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45107 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2020 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:20-cv-00183 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 15, 2020 2:39 PM EDT |
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Richard Sackler
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
jonathan Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies Inc
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith LLC
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
|
Defendant
ILENE SACKLER LEFOURT
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Patty Carol Leysen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2020 2:32 PM EDT |
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2757965.), filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 72 pgs Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Dismissal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Extension of Time Order | ||
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CVS HEALTH CORPORATION (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
3 | 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
4 | 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CVS PHARMACY, INC. (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALEX JOHN HAGAN on behalf of Defendants CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC. (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendants CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC. (PACKER, LESLIE) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON on behalf of Defendants CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC. (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | ||
CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | ||
8 | 8 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by PATTY CAROL LEYSEN. (Original document filed in Davidson County Superior Court, Case Number 20-CVS-112 and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
9 | 9 Notice of Right to Consent. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL CALLAIS ALLEN on behalf of Defendant RITE AID OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC. (ALLEN, MICHAEL) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KARI R. JOHNSON on behalf of Defendant RITE AID OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC. (JOHNSON, KARI) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ADAM L. WHITE on behalf of Plaintiff PATTY CAROL LEYSEN (WHITE, ADAM) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
13 | 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Discovery Requests by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC..(HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RITE AID OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC..(JOHNSON, KARI) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
Motions Referred: RE:13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re8 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Discovery Requests , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | ||
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
Motions Referred: RE:14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | ||
Thursday, March 05, 2020 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 03/05/2020, that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #13 ] is GRANTED IN PART, and the time for all properly served Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and any discovery served with said Complaint is extended for 60 days from the date of this Order, with leave to file a second motion requesting additional time based on the status of the case at that time.(Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
16 | 16 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 03/05/2020, that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #14 ] is GRANTED, and the time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended for 60 days from the date of this Order.(Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
17 | 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-140) re: MDL 2804 transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017. Received and filed on March 17, 2020. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
18 | 18 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-140) transferred this action to the Northern District of Ohio. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.] | |
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
19 | 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Middle. Case number 1:20-cv-00183. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |