Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-33898

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Lashonda A Hunt
Case #: 1:20-ap-00115
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2020
Terminated:Jun 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tilted Kilt Franchise Operating, LLC
1908 Thomes Ave.
Cheyenne, WY 82001
Represented By
Tilted Kilt Franchise Operating, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TK Skokie, LLC
7070 Carpenter Rd.
Skokie, IL 60077
Represented By
Timothy C. Culbertson
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/10 3:21 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-115 Closed . (Armstead, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2020
11 11 court Certificate of Service Wed 06/10 3:15 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Armstead, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 9 Order of Default,10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
10 10 order Default Judgment Tue 06/09 4:18 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 6/9/2020. (Camacho, Marilyn)
Related: [-] 8
9 9 order Default Tue 06/09 4:17 PM
Order of Default Related [+]. Signed on 6/9/2020 (Camacho, Marilyn)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, May 28, 2020
8 8 motion Default Judgment Thu 05/28 12:15 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Timothy C. Culbertson on behalf of TK Skokie, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2020 at 11:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 719, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Culbertson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 07, 2020
7 7 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 05/07 4:05 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 719 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 05/07/2020. (Davis, Shurray)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
6 6 notice Notice Wed 05/06 4:10 PM
Notice status hearing Filed by Timothy C. Culbertson on behalf of TK Skokie, LLC. (Culbertson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 05/06 11:13 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/07/2020 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 719 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 05/06/2020. (Davis, Shurray)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/18 12:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on Tilted Kilt Franchise Operating, LLC Related [+]. (Culbertson, Timothy)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
3 3 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Tue 03/17 4:23 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Timothy C. Culbertson on behalf of TK Skokie, LLC Related [+]. (Culbertson, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 03/17 4:20 PM
Summons Issued on Tilted Kilt Franchise Operating, LLC Answer Due 04/16/2020 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/17 4:20 PM
Adversary case 20-00115 (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by TK Skokie, LLC against Tilted Kilt Franchise Operating, LLC. (Fee Not Required). Status hearing to be held on 5/6/2020 at 10:15 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 719, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Culbertson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A