Minnesota District Court
Judge:Wilhelmina M Wright
Referred: Katherine M Menendez
Case #: 0:20-cv-00750
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2020
Terminated:Dec 11, 2020
Last checked: Monday Sep 14, 2020 4:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
One Mercedes-Benz Drive
Sandy Springs, GA 30328
Represented By
David Lurie
Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg
contact info
Nicholas H Callahan
Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg
contact info
Matthew F Singer
Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg
contact info
Plaintiff
Feldmann Imports Inc.
4901 American Boulevard West
Bloomington, MN 55437
Represented By
Steven Blatt
Bellavia Blatt, P.C
contact info
Samantha Ellingson
Thom Ellingson, Pllp
contact info
Aaron R Thom
Thom Ellingson, Pllp
contact info

GPO Dec 11 2020
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's motion for judgment on the pleadings 16 is GRANTED. (See order for details) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/11/2020. (RJE)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 14, 2020
34 34 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Mon 12/14 9:24 AM
JUDGMENT(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Friday, December 11, 2020
33 33 15 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 12/11 2:52 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's motion for judgment on the pleadings16 is GRANTED. (See order for details) (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/11/2020. (RJE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
32 32 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 07/15 4:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2020 re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (RJE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
31 31 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/02 11:15 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Lurie for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/2/2020. (NAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
30 30 misc LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Tue 06/30 2:33 PM
LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC re29 Reply filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Reply Tue 06/30 2:29 PM
REPLY re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Tue 06/30 1:52 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David B. Lurie. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7842753 filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Callahan, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
27 27 notice Notice re: Remote Public Access to Hearing Thu 06/25 12:36 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE: Remote Public Access Available. A hearing on the defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings is scheduled to be held by teleconference on 7/15/2020 at 1:00 PM. If any member of the public would like to attend the hearing by phone, they are instructed to contact Judge Wright's courtroom deputy at 651-848-1640 or wright_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to make appropriate arrangements. (RJE)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 06/25 12:35 PM
(TEXT-ONLY) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by the Defendant: The Motion Hearing is scheduled for 7/15/2020 at 1:00 PM. The motion hearing will be held via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. Dial-in instructions will be sent to counsel via email. (RJE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
25 25 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/23 11:41 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Joseph R. Feldmann in OPPOSITION TO16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Feldmann Imports Inc..(Blatt, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit "A" to Plaintiff's Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit "B" to Plaintiff's Affidavit
24 24 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/23 11:38 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Feldmann Imports Inc..(Blatt, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 05/20 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron R Thom (Thom, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
22 22 order Order/Notice to Attorney Tue 05/19 8:46 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The Court has reviewed the motion for judgment on the pleadings and determined that there is good cause to wait to issue a scheduling order until after the motion is decided, if necessary. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/19/2020.(BJP)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2020
21 21 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Mon 05/18 5:22 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Meet and Confer Statement Mon 05/18 5:21 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Mon 05/18 5:20 PM
LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC re18 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
18 18 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 05/18 5:14 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 05/18 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 05/18 5:09 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/18 4:37 PM
Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Singer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
14 14 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/12 1:27 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew F Singer for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/12/2020. (NAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2020
13 13 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 05/11 4:05 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Daimler North America Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Daimler International Nederland B.V. is a corporate parent of Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Callahan, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Mon 05/11 3:41 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew F. Singer. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7713267 filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Callahan, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/11 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas H Callahan on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Callahan, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2020
10 10 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/20 8:37 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven Blatt for Feldmann Imports Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/20/2020. (NAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Thu 04/16 9:19 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James Brandt. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7650496 filed by Feldmann Imports Inc.. (Thom, Aaron)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Thu 04/16 9:17 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven Blatt. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7650453 filed by Feldmann Imports Inc.. (Thom, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 04/06 12:46 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-750 (WMW/KMM) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/3/2020. (MKB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/24 2:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Feldmann Imports Inc.. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Ellingson, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
5 5 notice Notice - Judge Practice Pointers Wed 03/18 4:28 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/18 2:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (MKB)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 03/18 2:46 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-750 (WMW/TNL). (MKB)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Wed 03/18 2:30 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Feldmann Imports Inc.. (Ellingson, Samantha)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/18 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7574942) filed by Feldmann Imports Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Ellingson, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet