Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James G Carr
Case #: 3:20-cv-00593
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 15, 2020 6:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Elite Aerospace Group, Inc.
1641 Reynolds Avenue
Irvine, CA 92614
Defendant
Dustin Tillman
1641 Reynolds Avenue
Irvine, CA 92614
Defendant
Zeeshawn Zia
1641 Reynolds Avenue
Irvine, CA 92614
Plaintiff
Dr. Dalsukh Madia
Represented By
Kelsey J. Mincheff
Thompson Hine - Columbus
contact info
Stephanie M. Chmiel
Thompson Hine - Columbus
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
20 20 oth_evt Returned Mail Tue 09/28 2:20 PM
Returned Mail addressed to Party Elite Aerospace Group Inc.. Temporarily Away, Return to Sender. Related document(s)18 . (K,AR)
Related: [-]
19 19 oth_evt Returned Mail Tue 09/28 2:19 PM
Returned Mail addressed to Party Zeeshawn Zia. Temporrarily Away, Return to Sender. Related document(s)18 . (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Tue 09/21 2:15 PM
Notice of Pendency of Bankruptcy Proceeding and Automatic Stay filed by Elite Aerospace Group, Inc. Related document(s)14 . (S,DM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
17 17 oth_evt Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District Fri 01/08 1:00 PM
Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District issued on 10/27/2020 as to Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman and Zeeshawn Zia in the amount of $1,662,500.00 plus additional interest that accrues prior to the date of payment; the cost of litigation and attorneys fees in the amount of $20,774.50; and such other fees and costs incurred from the date of the entry of judgment on this Motion. Related document(s)16 ,14 . (M,L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order of Default Judgment
Thursday, January 07, 2021
16 16 oth_doc Praecipe Thu 01/07 10:55 AM
Praecipe for issuance of Certificate of Judgment for Registration in Another District $ 11.00 certification fee paid, receipt number AOHNDC-10549679 filed by Dalsukh Madia.(Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CLERKS CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT
Monday, November 30, 2020
15 15 oth_doc Affidavit/Declaration (atty event) Mon 11/30 9:08 AM
Supplemental Affidavit/Declaration of Stephanie M. Chmiel filed by Dalsukh Madia. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
14 14 order Default Judgment Tue 10/27 7:10 PM
Default Judgment in favor of the Plaintiff and against Defendants Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman, and Zeeshawn Zia as to all claims in the Complaint and in the amount of $1,662,500.00 plus additional interest that accrues prior to the date of payment; the cost of litigation and attorneys' fees in the amount of $20,774.50; and such other fees and costs incurred from the date of the entry of judgment on this Motion. The Plaintiff is granted leave to file a supplement affidavit to state interest, attorneys fees, and costs incurred through the date of judgment. Judge James G. Carr on 10/27/2020. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2020
13 13 motion Default Judgment (Motion for) Fri 10/16 2:43 PM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Dalsukh Madia.(Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A. - Executed Affidavit for MDJ,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B. - Chmiel Affidavit
12 12 notice Status Report (atty event) Fri 10/16 1:06 PM
Status Report filed by Dalsukh Madia. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
order Order Tue 10/13 3:19 PM
Order : [non-document] Plaintiff to file Status Report by 10/16/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 10/13/2020. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
11 11 oth_evt Default Entered Tue 09/15 9:11 PM
Default Entered on 9/15/2020 against Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman, and Zeeshawn Zia. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Tina M. Damoah, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s)10 . (D,TM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 09/15 9:14 PM
Copy of11 Default Entered mailed to Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., at 1641 Reynolds Avenue, Irvine, CA 92614, Dustin Tillm at 1641 Reynolds Avenue, Irvine, CA 92614, and Zeeshawn Zia at 1641 Reynolds Avenue, Irvine, CA 92614 on 9/16/2020. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
10 10 notice Application to Enter Default Mon 09/14 3:07 PM
Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendants Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman, and Zeeshawn Zia filed by Dalsukh Madia. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
9 9 motion Extension (answer complaint) Tue 07/07 5:26 PM
Joint Motion for extension of time until 09/04/2020 to answer filed by Plaintiff Dalsukh Madia. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 07/07 7:44 PM
Order [non-document] granting9 Joint Motion for extension of time until 09/04/2020 to answer to2 amended complaint. Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman and Zeeshawn Zia answer due 9/4/2020. Judge James G. Carr on 7/7/2020. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 07/07 7:49 PM
Copy of [non-document] Order on Joint Motion for extension of time to answer, mailed to Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., 1641 Reynolds Avenue,Irvine, CA 92614; Dustin Tillman, 1641 Reynolds Avenue, Irvine, CA 92614 and Zeeshawn Zia, 1641 Reynolds Avenue, Irvine, CA 92614 on 7/8/2020. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2020
8 8 motion Extension (answer complaint) Thu 06/18 9:31 AM
Joint Motion for extension of time until 7/03/2020 to answer, move or otherwise plead to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dalsukh Madia. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 06/18 1:41 PM
Order [non-document] granting8 Joint Motion for extension of time until 7/06/2020 to answer to Complaint. Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., answer due 7/6/2020; Dustin Tillman answer due 7/6/2020; Zeeshawn Zia answer due 7/6/2020. Related Document(s)1 and2 . Judge James G. Carr on 6/18/2020. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 06/18 1:45 PM
Copy of [non-document] Order dated 6/18/2020 mailed to Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., 1641 Reynolds Avenue, Irvine, CA 92614; Dustin Tillman, 1641 Reynolds Avenue, Irvine, CA 92614; Zeeshawn Zia, 1641 Reynolds Avenue, Irvine, CA 92614 mailed to on 6/18/2020. (D,TM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/19 10:46 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Dalsukh Madia. Dustin Tillman waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020 filed on behalf of Dalsukh Madia (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/19 10:44 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Dalsukh Madia. Zeeshawn Zia waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020 filed on behalf of Dalsukh Madia (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/19 10:43 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Dalsukh Madia. Elite Aerospace Group, Inc. waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020 filed on behalf of Dalsukh Madia (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 29, 2020
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Sun 03/29 5:09 PM
Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kelsey J. Mincheff for Plaintiff Dalsukh Madia. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related [+]. Judge James G. Carr on 3/29/2020. (D,TM)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/25 4:13 PM
Motion for attorney Kelsey J. Mincheff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-9882883, filed by Plaintiff Dalsukh Madia.(Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. - Certficate of Good Standing
Friday, March 20, 2020
3 3 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 03/20 9:11 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman, Zeeshawn Zia. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 03/20 8:58 AM
Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 03/20 8:59 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Fri 03/20 9:12 AM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/19 3:30 PM
Amended complaint against Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman, Zeeshawn Zia. Filed by Dalsukh Madia. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Loan Guaranty,
Att: 3 Summons to Elite,
Att: 4 Summons to Tillman,
Att: 5 Summons to Zia
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/19 2:27 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Elite Aerospace Group, Inc., Dustin Tillman, Zeeshawn Zia. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9870955.. Filed by Dalsukh Madia. (Chmiel, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to Elite,
Att: 2 Summons to Tillman,
Att: 3 Summons to Zia,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet