Coronel et al v. Decker et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Alison J Nathan |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-02472 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241in Habeas Corpus: INS |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 16, 2020 5:21 AM EDT |
Petitioner
Ananda Rajapaksha
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Cristian Arriaga Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Jose Otero
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Fedor Bondarenko
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Josefina Coronel
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Alvaro Negrette Mejia
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Juan Morocho Sumba
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Ramon Garcia Ponce
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Jose Madrid
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Miguel Miranda
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Florencio Moristica
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Director Ronald P. Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Sheriff Carl E. Dubois
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Director Thomas Decker
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Attorney General William P. Barr
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Warden William Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Warden Steven Ahrendt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
91 | 91
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 01/17 4:36 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:90 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Carl E. Dubois, Chad Wolf, Ronald P. Edwards, Steven Ahrendt, Thomas Decker, William Anderson, William P. Barr against Alvaro Negrette Mejia, Ananda Rajapaksha, Cristian Arriaga Reyes, Fedor Bondarenko, Jose Otero. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion & Order dated January 17, 2023, the Court has GRANTED Respondents' motion to dismiss Otero's claims as moot. This dismissal is without prejudice to Otero's ability to seek any available habeas relief from the appropriate court should he be re-detained by federal immigration authorities; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/17/2023) (km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
90 | 90
9
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 01/17 2:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re:86 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by William Anderson, Carl E. Dubois, William P. Barr, Chad Wolf, Steven Ahrendt, Thomas Decker, Ronald P. Edwards. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Respondents' motion to dismiss Otero's claims as moot. This dismissal is without prejudice to Otero's ability to seek any available habeas relief from the appropriate court should he be re-detained by federal immigration authorities. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Dkt. No. 86 and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by United States Circuit Judge, sitting by designation Alison J. Nathan on 1/17/2023) (vfr) |
|
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Tue 01/17 4:39 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km) |