New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:20-cv-02477
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2020
Terminated:Oct 09, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 16, 2020 6:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Amiee Lynn Inc.
Represented By
Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Borrelli
Represented By
Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Defendant
PBS Home Goods, LLC
Represented By
Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Kimberle Portante
Represented By
Ravindra Kumar Shaw
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Greenberg
Represented By
Irene Chan
Phillips & Associates
contact info
H. Joseph Cronen
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Steven John Fingerhut
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
35 35 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 12/16 12:57 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff Nicole Greenberg and Defendants Amiee Lynn Inc. ("Amiee Lynn"), PBS Homc Goods, LLC, ("PBS"), Jennifer Borrelli ("Borrelli") and Kimberlee Portante ("Portante") (all together collectively "Defendants"). by and through their undersigned counsel, that the above-captioned action be andis hereby dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, and with no award of attorneys' fees, costs or disbursements by the Court to any party. SO ORDERED., PBS Home Goods, LLC, Kimberle Portante (Individually), Amiee Lynn Inc. and Jennifer Borrelli (Individually) terminated. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/16/2020) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
34 34 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Tue 12/15 11:08 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Amiee Lynn Inc., Jennifer Borrelli, PBS Home Goods, LLC, Kimberle Portante..(Shaw, Ravindra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
32 32 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 10/13 8:54 AM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle of this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within seventy-five days. All filing deadlines and conference dates are adjourned sine die. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/9/2020) (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 09/15 10:11 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/6/2020 at 10:00 AM through video conference.(ah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Mon 08/31 10:57 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED First Mediation Conference scheduled for 9/10/2020 at 10:00 AM through telephone conference.(ah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 08/17 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/16/2020..(rpr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/12 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Joseph Cronen on behalf of Nicole Greenberg..(Cronen, H.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
30 30 order Order on Motion for Conference Tue 08/11 8:54 AM
ORDER granting29 Letter Motion for Conference. THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 12, 2020, IS HEREBY ADJOURNED TO OCTOBER 13, 2020, AT 11 A.M. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
29 29 motion Conference Fri 08/07 2:46 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference Related [+] addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Ravindra K. Shaw dated August 7, 2020. Document filed by Amiee Lynn Inc., Jennifer Borrelli, PBS Home Goods, LLC, Kimberle Portante..(Shaw, Ravindra)
Related: [-] quest for 60-day Adjournment of Initial Pretrial Conference
Friday, July 31, 2020
28 28 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Fri 07/31 3:03 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/10/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
27 27 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 07/28 5:12 PM
ORDER: Counsel and any interested parties are directed to dial (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/28/2020) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2020
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/27 7:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ravindra Kumar Shaw on behalf of Amiee Lynn Inc., Jennifer Borrelli, PBS Home Goods, LLC, Kimberle Portante..(Shaw, Ravindra)
Related: [-]
25 25 21 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 07/27 7:31 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Amiee Lynn Inc., Jennifer Borrelli, PBS Home Goods, LLC, Kimberle Portante..(Shaw, Ravindra)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/27 7:30 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amiee Lynn Inc., PBS Home Goods, LLC..(Shaw, Ravindra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 07/23 9:49 AM
ORDER granting22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JULY 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/22 6:13 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Defendants dated July 22, 2020. Document filed by Amiee Lynn Inc., Jennifer Borrelli, PBS Home Goods, LLC, Kimberle Portante..(Shaw, Ravindra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
21 21 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 07/09 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Steven John Fingerhut on behalf of Nicole Greenberg. New Address: Phillips & Associates, PLLC, 45 Broadway, Suite 430, New York, New York, USA 10006, (212) 248-7431..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 06/22 7:39 PM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JULY 22, 2020. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Park, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/19 12:21 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 Amended Complaint, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Ravindra K. Shaw dated June 19, 2020. Document filed by Amiee Lynn Inc., Jennifer Borrelli, PBS Home Goods, LLC, Kimberle Portante..(Shaw, Ravindra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 06/03 9:33 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Amiee Lynn Inc. served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 06/03 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. PBS Home Goods, LLC served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2020
16 16 service Summons Issued Thu 05/28 3:08 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer Borrelli..(pc)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Thu 05/28 3:07 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amiee Lynn Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Thu 05/28 3:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kimberle Portante..(pc)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Thu 05/28 3:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PBS Home Goods, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/27 3:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jennifer Borrelli, re:3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/27 3:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kimberle Portante, re:3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/27 3:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amiee Lynn Inc., re:3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/27 3:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PBS Home Goods, LLC, re:3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/21 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Irene Chan on behalf of Nicole Greenberg..(Chan, Irene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2020
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/13 2:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven John Fingerhut to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Tue 05/12 11:42 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Jennifer Borrelli, re:3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Tue 05/12 11:41 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Kimberle Portante, re:3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Tue 05/12 11:41 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to PBS Home Goods, LLC, re:3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Tue 05/12 11:40 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Amiee Lynn Inc., re:3 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/25 3:31 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Amiee Lynn Inc., Jennifer Borrelli, PBS Home Goods, LLC, Kimberle Portante with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Nicole Greenberg. Related document:1 Complaint..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- NYCCHR Letter
Monday, March 23, 2020
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/23 11:06 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/23 11:06 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pne)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/23 11:06 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pne)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2020
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/20 5:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/20 5:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Amiee Lynn Inc., Jennifer Borrelli, PBS Home Goods, LLC, Kimberle Portante. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19184212)Document filed by Nicole Greenberg..(Fingerhut, Steven)
Related: [-]