California Northern District Court
Judge:Phyllis J Hamilton
Case #: 4:19-cv-07123
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Oct 29, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Apr 26, 2020 3:02 AM PDT
Defendant
NSO Group Technologies Limited
Represented By
Joseph N Akrotirianakis
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Aaron S Craig
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Q Cyber Technologies Limited
Represented By
Joseph N Akrotirianakis
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Aaron S Craig
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
King & Spalding LLP
Represented By
Jessica R. MacGregor
Long & Levit LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Facebook Inc.
Represented By
Travis LeBlanc
Cooley LLP
contact info
Kyle Christopher Wong
Cooley LLP
contact info
Elizabeth B Prelogar
Cooley LLP
contact info
Joseph Douglas Mornin
Cooley LLP
contact info
Michael R. Dreeben
Omelveny Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel Joseph Grooms
Cooley LLP
contact info
Michael Graham Rhodes
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WhatsApp Inc.
Represented By
Kyle Christopher Wong
Cooley LLP
contact info
Elizabeth B Prelogar
Cooley LLP
contact info
Joseph Douglas Mornin
Cooley LLP
contact info
Michael R. Dreeben
Omelveny Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel Joseph Grooms
Cooley LLP
contact info
Michael Graham Rhodes
Cooley LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 25 2020
ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Set Aside Default; denying 29 Motion for Alternative Service. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
GPO Apr 13 2020
ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 28 Motion for Sanctions. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
GPO Apr 22 2020
ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 47 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
GPO May 06 2020
ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 59 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 65 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
GPO May 08 2020
ORDER Re: Motions to File Under Seal and Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
GPO Jul 16 2020
ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Dismiss; denying 95 Motion to Stay. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
GPO Aug 10 2020
ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 115 Motion to Shorten Time. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
GPO Aug 17 2020
ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 116 MOTION to Compel. Responses due by 9/2/2020. Replies due by 9/9/2020. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
GPO Sep 29 2020
ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 116 Motion to Compel; granting 117 Motion to Stay; granting 133 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
GPO May 15 2023
ORDER re briefing and hearing on motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/15/2023. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2023)
GPO Sep 14 2023
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 164, 176, 179, 181, 184, 185, 188, 191, 195, 197, 198, 200, 202, 205, 209, 212, 214 motions to seal, setting hearing on 186 motion for protective order and 215 motion to dismiss (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
GPO Oct 24 2023
ORDER re 224 discovery letter brief. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/24/2023. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
GPO Nov 15 2023
ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 186 Motion for Protective Order; denying 208 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 215 Motion to Dismiss; granting 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
GPO Feb 23 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 236 motion to compel; denying 240 motion to compel; granting 265 motion for relief from case management schedule. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2024)
GPO Mar 26 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying in part 288 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting 294 Motion for Leave to File. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2024)
GPO May 02 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton re 288 motion for issuance of letter rogatory, 303 motion to seal. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2024)
GPO Jul 30 2024
ORDER denying request for telephone conference. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/30/2024. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2024)
GPO Aug 01 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 331 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; granting in part and denying in part 332 Motion to Compel; granting 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 341 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; granting 345 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; granting 346 Motion for Leave to File; denying 306 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 307 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; denying 308 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 313 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; granting 319 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; denying 320 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; granting 323 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2024)
GPO Aug 27 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton re 360 366 368 369 discovery letter briefs. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2024)
GPO Aug 30 2024
ORDER re 371 letter brief. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/30/2024. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2024)
GPO Sep 05 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton re 373 Motion for Reconsideration. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2024)
GPO Sep 27 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 388 Administrative Motion ; denying 392 Administrative Motion. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2024)
GPO Nov 06 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 455 Administrative Motion. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2024)
GPO Dec 18 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 481 Administrative Motion. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2024)
GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER by Judge Hamilton re 397 Motion for Summary Judgment; 401 Motion for Summary Judgment; 406 Motion for Sanctions. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2024)
GPO Jan 10 2025
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 480 Motion to substitute expert; denying 498 Discovery Letter Brief. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2025)
GPO Jan 16 2025
ORDER re pretrial conference and trial dates. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/16/2025. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
GPO Jan 22 2025
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 538 stipulation to continue trial date. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2025)
GPO Mar 10 2025
ORDER by Judge Hamilton re 560 Administrative Motion; 571 Stipulation. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2025)
GPO Mar 21 2025
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 549 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 550 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2025)
GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER by Judge Hamilton re 662 Motion to Stay; 663 Administrative Motion. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2025)
GPO Apr 15 2025
Final pretrial order by Judge Hamilton. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2025)
GPO Apr 21 2025
ORDER re 687 motion for leave to file motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/21/2025. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2025)
GPO Apr 21 2025
ORDER clarifying summary judgment order re conspiracy. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/21/2025. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2025)
GPO Apr 23 2025
ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 687 Motion for Leave to File. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2025)
GPO Apr 25 2025
Second final pretrial order. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/25/2025. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2025)
GPO May 04 2025
ORDER re proposed final jury instructions. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/4/2025. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2025)

1. WhatsApp ties NSO Group's hacking operations to America in new court evidence (tech.newstatesman.com)
Submitted Sun 04/26/2020
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
738 738 trial Jury Notes Tue 05/06 4:25 PM
Jury Notes. (kc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
737 737 trial Jury Instructions Tue 05/06 4:24 PM
Final Jury Instructions. (kc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
736 736 trial Jury Verdict Tue 05/06 4:20 PM
JURY VERDICT. (kc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
735 735 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Jury Trial - Completed Tue 05/06 4:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Jury Trial completed on 5/6/2025. Deadline to file exhibits by 5/16/2025.Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2025)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trial Log and Exhibit List
Monday, May 05, 2025
734 734 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Jury Trial - Held ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 05/05 4:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Jury Trial held on 5/5/2025. Further Jury Trial set for 5/6/2025 at 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.(kc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2025)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Witness and Exhibit Log
Sunday, May 04, 2025
733 733 2 pgs order Order Sun 05/04 1:23 PM
ORDER re proposed final jury instructions. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/4/2025. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
732 732 trial Proposed Jury Instructions Sun 05/04 12:15 AM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Meta Platforms, Inc., WhatsApp Inc. .(Andres, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Parties' Jointly Proposed Jury Instructions,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Blind Copy of Parties' Jointly Proposed Jury Instructions,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Blind Copy of Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Blind Copy of Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions
Friday, May 02, 2025
731 731 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Jury Trial - Held Fri 05/02 4:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Jury Trial held on 5/2/2025. Further Jury trial set for May 5, 2025, at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2025)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Witness and Exhibit Log
730 730 misc Transcript Fri 05/02 1:18 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on April 24, 2025, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2025. (mfk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 713 Transcript Order (s)713
Thursday, May 01, 2025
729 729 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Jury Trial - Held Thu 05/01 2:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Jury Trial held on 5/1/2025. Further Jury trial set for 5/2/2025, at 8:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2025)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Witness and Exhibit Log
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
728 728 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Jury Trial - Held Wed 04/30 2:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Jury Trial held on 4/30/2025. Further Jury trial set for 5/1/2025 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.(kc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2025)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trial Log
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
727 727 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 3:12 PM
ORDER FOR JURY MEALS DURING DELIBERATIONS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/2025. (kc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
726 726 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Jury Trial - Begun Tue 04/29 3:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton: Jury Trial held on 4/29/2025. Further Jury trial set for April 30, 2025, at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.(kc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2025)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trial Log
725 725 misc Statement Tue 04/29 12:52 AM
Statement RE EVIDENCE OF EXPORT CONTROLS by NSO Group Technologies Limited, Q Cyber Technologies Limited. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
Related: [-]