In re: New York City Board
Original Case: 1:96-cv-08414
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01008 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 30, 2020 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
New York State Education Department
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Gulino
|
|
Plaintiff
Mayling Ralph
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Wilds
|
|
Plaintiff
Nia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Audrey Wigfall
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/30/2020 4:31 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, FILED. [2805833] 20-1008 [Entered: 03/19/2020 04:37 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 959 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/24/2020, RECEIVED.[2805837] 20-1008 [Entered: 03/19/2020 04:46 PM] |