Texas Northern District Court
Judge:John R Parker
Referred: John R Parker
Case #: 6:20-cv-00022
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2020
Re-opened:Aug 30, 2022
Terminated:Aug 30, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
41 41 order Judgment Tue 08/30 4:53 PM
JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the Courts Order of Dismissal entered this day, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Mauldons Complaint and all claims therein are dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 8/30/2022) (dsr)
Related: [-]
40 40 9 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Tue 08/30 1:52 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: For the reasons set out, Mauldon's Complaint and all claims alleged therein are DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 8/30/2022) (dsr)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/30 1:34 PM
NOTICE of case received by Texas Western and opened as case 4:22-CV-035, and by Texas Eastern and opened as case 6:22-CV-00341, both filed 8/30/2022 re:38 Order to Sever. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 receipt of case transferred-Texas Eastern
misc Order Receipt Tue 08/30 1:35 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:38. mailed to Plaintiff. Tue Aug 30 13:35:13 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 08/30 1:53 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:40. mailed to Plaintiff Tue Aug 30 13:53:03 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 08/30 4:53 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:41. mailed to Plaintiff. Tue Aug 30 16:53:32 CDT 2022 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
38 38 3 pgs order Order to Sever Mon 08/29 4:42 PM
ORDER OF SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER. It is therefore, ORDERED that: 1. All claims by Mauldon arising from his incarceration at the N5 Unit in Fort Stockton, Texas, are severed from the instant Complaint and transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Pecos Division, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). 2. All claims by Mauldon arising from his incarceration at the Michael Unit in Tennessee Colony, Texas, are severed from the instant Complaint and transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). (Clerk to open new case for each severed action and transfer them to the District as set out in the order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 8/29/2022) (dsr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
37 37 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 08/18 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. New address: TDCJ Estes Unit, 1100 Highway 1807, Venus, TX 76084. (pnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
36 36 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 08/08 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. New address: TDCJ Huntsville Unit, 815 12th Street, Huntsville, TX 77348. (pnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
35 35 misc Public Correspondence Received Tue 07/19 2:35 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
34 34 respm Response/Objection Tue 01/18 10:32 AM
RESPONSE filed by Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr re:33 Judge's Questionnaire. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
33 33 order Judge's Questionnaire ~Util - Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Full List) Wed 12/29 5:01 PM
Judge's Questionnaire sent to Gerrald W. Mauldon, Jr. Responses due by 1/19/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 12/29/2021) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 12/29 5:03 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:33. mailed to Plaintiff. Wed Dec 29 17:03:37 CST 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
32 32 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 07/26 3:15 PM
SECOND NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. Mailed plaintiff a copy of public docket sheet reflecting our office receiving both notices. (pnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
31 31 misc Public Correspondence Received Wed 06/02 8:20 AM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. A Clerk response is not required. (dsr) (Main Document 31 replaced on 6/2/2021) (dsr)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 06/01 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. New address: TDCJ Stringfellow Unit, 1200 FM 655, Rosharon, TX 77583. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
29 29 misc Administrative Record Fri 05/14 11:58 AM
Authenticated Records re: Order27 received and maintained in chambers received from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
28 28 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for TRO Tue 05/11 11:53 AM
ORDER denying25 Motion for Leave to File, and denying26 Motion for TRO. Clerk to mail Mauldon a blank Civil Rights form marked Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 5/11/2021) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 05/11 11:55 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:28. mailed to Plaintiff along with a form Amended Civil Rights suit. Tue May 11 11:55:06 CDT 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 05/11 11:57 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:28. mailed to Plaintiff along with a form Amended Civil Rights suit. Tue May 11 11:57:02 CDT 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
27 27 4 pgs order Order Fri 04/30 2:06 PM
ORDER FOR AUTHENTICATED RECORDS: the officials listed in this order shall provide the Court with authenticated and verified copies of any and all records pertaining to the specific allegations in Plaintiffs Complaint. An authorized custodian of the records of the respective entity must execute the attached Certification of Business Records (Certification) and attach the executed Certification to the records provided to the Court. The records and executed Certification must be provided to the Court on or before May 31, 2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 4/30/2021) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 04/30 2:10 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 27. mailed to Plaintiff. Fri Apr 30 14:10:01 CDT 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 04/30 2:39 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:27. mailed to Plaintiff. Fri Apr 30 14:39:04 CDT 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
26 26 misc Public Correspondence Received Thu 04/22 12:05 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. in regards to his medications not being filled. (pnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
25 25 motion Leave to File Fri 01/29 3:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Evidence filed by Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cov ltr & env
misc Order Receipt Fri 01/29 3:11 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. mailing label only for public docket sheet. Fri Jan 29 15:11:27 CST 2021 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2020
24 24 misc Public Correspondence Received Thu 06/25 3:53 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. No response necessary. (pnp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter and envelope
Monday, June 08, 2020
23 23 misc Public Correspondence Received Mon 06/08 3:35 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. (pnp)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Public Correspondence Received Mon 06/08 3:32 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. (pnp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
21 21 3 pgs order Order Wed 05/20 10:15 AM
ORDER: Petitioner's requests for expedited review and immediate release to parole are denied. Petitioner's habeas petitions remain pending and will be considered in due course. Repeated frivolous filings in a particular case can slow the review process and delay the Court in reaching a decision on the merits. Filings like Petitioner's fifteen letters of correspondence may be construed as frivolous, and the Court warns Petitioner that if he files additional frivolous motions in this case, sanctions may be imposed against him, Those sanctions may include monetary sanctions or a complete bar to filing pleadings without leave of the Court. The Court will not consider or act on any filing submitted in violation of this order. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/20/2020) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 05/20 10:16 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:21. mailed to Petitioner. Wed May 20 10:16:01 CDT 2020 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
20 20 misc Public Correspondence Received Fri 05/15 3:18 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. No response necessary. (pnp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover letter
Thursday, May 14, 2020
19 19 misc Public Correspondence Received Thu 05/14 3:34 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. No clerk response is necessary at this time. (dsr) (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/14/2020) additional pages
Monday, May 11, 2020
18 18 misc Public Correspondence Received Tue 05/12 2:34 PM
Public correspondence filed, received from Gerrald W Mauldon, Jr. (pnp)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Public Correspondence Received Mon 05/11 4:24 PM
Public correspondence filed received from Gerrald W Mauldon, Jr. (pnp)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Public Correspondence Received Mon 05/11 4:02 PM
Public correspondence filed received from Gerrald W Mauldon, Jr. (pnp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
15 15 misc Public Correspondence Received Thu 04/30 1:34 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. No clerk response is necessary at this time. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2020
14 14 misc Public Correspondence Received Fri 04/24 9:34 AM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. No clerk response is necessary. (dsr)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Public Correspondence Received Fri 04/24 9:20 AM
Public correspondence received regarding deductions from trust account from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk response ltr
Friday, April 10, 2020
12 12 misc Public Correspondence Received Fri 04/10 2:31 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk response ltr
11 11 misc Public Correspondence Received Fri 04/10 2:08 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. No clerk response is necessary at this time. (dsr)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Public Correspondence Received Fri 04/10 1:55 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. regarding including all evidence in cause numbers 6:19-CV-034, 066, 067 and 068 in this case. (dsr)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Prisoner/Social Security Consent Fri 04/10 1:53 PM
Prisoner Consent by Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (dsr)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Public Correspondence Received Fri 04/10 1:51 PM
Public correspondence received from Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. No clerk response is necessary at this time. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2020
7 7 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 03/27 2:25 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John R. Parker for all further proceedings. Judge James Wesley Hendrix no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/27/2020) (dsr)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order For Partial Filing Fee Fri 03/27 2:20 PM
Order For Partial Filing Fee in amount of $7.83 with a balance of $342.17 remaining. The custodial agency shall collect the initial fee from the trust fund, when available, and forward the initial fee to the Clerk of the District Court. The balance of the filing fee shall be paid in monthly installments as provided in 28: U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/27/2020) (dsr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 03/27 2:27 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 6, 7. mailed to Plaintiff. Fri Mar 27 14:27:13 CDT 2020 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
5 5 misc Amended Document Thu 03/26 2:44 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. Amendment to1 Complaint. Plaintiff amended claim amount. (pnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
utility Add and Terminate Judges (Public Entry) Tue 03/24 8:35 AM
Magistrate Judge John R. Parker no longer assigned to case. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
4 4 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Mon 03/23 3:24 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (dsr)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Hendrix Mon 03/23 3:24 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dsr)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/23 3:21 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. (dsr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/23 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Director, TDCJ-CID filed by Gerrald Wayne Mauldon, Jr. (Filing fee $No fee paid (Motion for IFP pending)) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (dsr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cov ltr & env
misc Order Receipt Mon 03/23 3:26 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 3, 4. mailed to Plaintiff. Mon Mar 23 15:26:09 CDT 2020 (crt)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges (Public Entry) Mon 03/23 3:35 PM
Magistrate Judge John R. Parker added. (dsr)
Related: [-]