SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. Lahr et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward G Smith |
Case #: | 5:20-cv-01593 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2021 |
Case in other court: | EDPA, 19-c-496 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 19, 2020 7:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
THOMAS MEGAS
|
|
Plaintiff
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
TODD LAHR
Terminated: 06/23/2020
134 E 3RD Street
Nazareth, PA 18064 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
68 | 68
misc
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Fri 11/18 3:42 PM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re67 Transcript - PDF, 11/18/2022 Entered and Copies Emailed. (sg) |
|
67 | 67
misc
Transcript - PDF
Fri 11/18 3:38 PM
TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT, held on 1/20/2022, before Judge EDWARD G. SMITH. Court Reporter/Transcriber NEAL R. GROSS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2023. (sg) |