City of Luverne, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45109 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Middle, 2:20-cv-00136 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 15, 2020 3:24 PM EDT |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Luverne, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2020 3:22 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Luverne, Alabama. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc1 for pdf) (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | ||
1 | 1 154 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602056947.), filed by City of Luverne, Alabama. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt | ||
2 | 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by City of Luverne, Alabama. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of1 Complaint. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, Houston) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
6 | 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Strubel, John) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
7 | 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by V. Godfrey for: Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Jennifer Lockwood for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Noramco, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
9 | 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Kelly W. for McKesson Corporation served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
10 | 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Sam G. for Actavis, LLC served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; Cephalon, Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
11 | 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by (illegible) for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
12 | 12 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Paul S. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
13 | 13 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by M. Wyatt for Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
14 | 14 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Daniel Kelley for Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
15 | 15 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by (illegible) for Johnson & Johnson served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Friday, March 13, 2020 | ||
16 | 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by (not signed) for Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (kh, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
18 | 18 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 3/16/2020 by the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio.(wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | ||
17 | 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward". Plf's counsel is notified via this notice that service has not been perfected. (bes, ) [Transferred from almd on 3/24/2020.] | |
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
19 | 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Middle. Case number 2:20-cv-00136. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |