Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05166
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 20, 2020 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
AMBER WILLIAMS
Represented By
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 06, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/13 12:24 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/24 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by AMBER WILLIAMS. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]