Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05176
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2020
Terminated:May 02, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 20, 2020 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
DAVID H. WILLIAMSON
Represented By
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Law Firm Apc - San Diego Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, May 02, 2022
2 2 27 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/03 3:47 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A and Exhibit B are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/2/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/24 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DAVID H. WILLIAMSON. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]