Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Case #: 8:20-cv-00780
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2020
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2020 4:19 AM EDT
Amicus
Amici Curiae Public Health and Human Rights Experts
Represented By
Susanna M Buergel
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton And Garrison
contact info
David Kimball Stanley
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton And Garrison
contact info
Maureen A Sweeney
Maryland Carey School Of Law
contact info
Darren Johnson
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton And Garrison
contact info
Petitioner
William Kemcha
Worcester County Detention Center 5022 Joyner Road
Snow Hill, MD 21863
Represented By
Sirine Shebaya
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers' G
contact info
Petitioner
Angel Guzman Cedillo
WORCESTER COUNTY DETENTION CENTER 5022 Joyner Road
Snow Hill, MD 21863
Represented By
Nicholas Taichi Steiner
American Civil Liberties Union Of Maryland
contact info
Sirine Shebaya
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers' G
contact info
Eunice Cho
Aclu National Prison Project
contact info
Stephen Kang
Aclu Foundation Immigrant'S Rights Project
contact info
Amber Qureshi
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Michael K.T. Tan
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
David Cyrus Fathi
Aclu National Prison Project
contact info
Matthew S Vogel
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Omar C Jadwat
American Civil Libterties Union
contact info
Adina B Appelbaum
Capital Area Immigrants' Rights (cair) Coalition
contact info
Petitioner
Mauricio Coreas
HOWARD COUNTY DETENTION CENTER 7301 Waterloo Road
Jessup, MD 20794
Represented By
Nicholas Taichi Steiner
American Civil Liberties Union Of Maryland
contact info
Sirine Shebaya
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers' G
contact info
Eunice Cho
Aclu National Prison Project
contact info
Stephen Kang
Aclu Foundation Immigrant'S Rights Project
contact info
Amber Qureshi
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Michael K.T. Tan
Aclu Immigrants' Rights Project
contact info
David Cyrus Fathi
Aclu National Prison Project
contact info
Matthew S Vogel
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Omar C Jadwat
American Civil Libterties Union
contact info
Adina B Appelbaum
Capital Area Immigrants' Rights (cair) Coalition
contact info
Respondent
Matthew T. Albence
US Immigration and Customs Enforcement 500 12th St., S.W.
Washington, DC 20536
Represented By
Vincent J Vaccarella
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Respondent
Warden Donna Bounds
WORCESTER COUNTY DETENTION CENTER 5022 Joyner Road
Snow Hill, MD 21863
Represented By
Vincent J Vaccarella
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Respondent
Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Office of General Counsel United States Department of Homeland Security Mail Stop 3650
Washington, DC 20528
Represented By
Vincent J Vaccarella
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Respondent
Jack Kavanaugh
Warden Howard County Detention Center 7301 Waterloo Road
Jessup, MD 21704
Represented By
Vincent J Vaccarella
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Respondent
Janean Ohin
US Immigration and Customs Enforcement 31 Hopkins Plaza 7th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21201
Represented By
Vincent J Vaccarella
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Apr 03 2020
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/3/2020. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
GPO May 07 2020
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/7/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 07/10/2020 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 10, 2020
137 137 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/10 6:50 PM
NOTICE by Angel Guzman Cedillo, Mauricio Coreas, Jose Quinteros Hernandez, William Kemcha, Julio Navarro Martinez, Wilson Ramos Reyes re 131 Order, Joint Proposal regarding Health Inspection(Shebaya, Sirine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A - Homer Venters CV,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B - Fred Rottnek CV
Thursday, July 09, 2020
136 136 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/09 3:54 PM
NOTICE by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Donna Bounds, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Jack Kavanaugh, Janean Ohin (Vaccarella, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
135 135 appeal USCA Order Wed 07/08 1:27 PM
ORDER of USCA consolidating case 20-7005 with case 20-6984 as to132 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew T. Albence, Jack Kavanaugh, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Donna Bounds, Janean Ohin (nus, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
134 134 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 07/08 12:33 PM
USCA Case Number 20-7005 for132 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew T. Albence, Jack Kavanaugh, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Donna Bounds, Janean Ohin. Case Manager - Michael Radday (nus, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
133 133 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 07/07 11:38 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re132 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(nus, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
132 132 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 07/06 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Matthew T. Albence, Donna Bounds, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Jack Kavanaugh, Janean Ohin. (Vaccarella, Vincent)
Related: [-]
131 131 order Order Mon 07/06 3:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. As agreed by the parties at the July 6, 2020 Case Management Conference, the parties shall submit by FRIDAY, July 10, 2020, a joint list of proposed experts as well as a joint proposal as to the expert's mandate. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/6/2020. (nrs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
130 130 minutes Telephone Conference Mon 07/06 2:47 PM
Case Management Conference held on 7/6/2020 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(FTR - 1A.) (bus, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
129 129 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 07/06 10:32 AM
USCA Case Number 20-6984 for119 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew T. Albence, Jack Kavanaugh, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Donna Bounds, Janean Ohin. Case Manager - Michael Radday (nu, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
128 128 order Order Mon 07/06 10:31 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court is in receipt of127 Correspondence, informing the Court that one government attorney is unable to attend today's scheduled telephone status conference. Because another government attorney can attend the conference, the call will PROCEED AS SCHEDULED. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/6/2020. Associated Cases: 8:20-cv-00780-TDC, 1:20-cv-01304-TDC(nrs, Chambers)
Related: [-]