Long v. De Feis et al.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Analisa Torres |
Referred: | Ona T Wang |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-02530 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2020 |
Re-opened: | May 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 20, 2020 6:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
De Feis O'Connell & Rose, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rose Ramey Long
individually 1 East Parkway North
Memphis, TN 38104 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Nicholas M DeFeis
Terminated: 05/14/2020
43 Flint Avenue
Larchmont, NY 10538 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vera M Kachnowski
Terminated: 05/14/2020
830 Monroe Street
Hoboken, NJ 07030 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Philip C Patterson
Terminated: 05/14/2020
140 Secor Lane
Pelham, NY 10803 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
67 | 67
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 06/17 2:30 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to65 Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Rose Ramey Long. USCA Case Number 21-0427 Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 06/17/2021..(nd) |