In re: New York City Board of
Original Case: 1:96-cv-08414
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01029 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 20, 2022 3:35 AM EST |
Defendant
New York State Education Department
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Gulino
|
|
Plaintiff
Mayling Ralph
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Wilds
|
|
Plaintiff
Nia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Margaret Lahai
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/20/2022 3:29 AM EST |
Wednesday, March 18, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, FILED. [2807036] 20-1029 [Entered: 03/23/2020 12:18 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 960 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/24/2020, RECEIVED.[2807040] 20-1029 [Entered: 03/23/2020 12:22 PM] |