Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Robert W Gettleman
Referred: Gabriel A Fuentes
Case #: 1:20-cv-01962
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2020
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, 2020-L-003010
Last checked: Monday Sep 21, 2020 3:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Marrio Hotel Services, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Michael Burke
Johnson & Bell, Ltd.
contact info
Michael Joseph Linneman
Johnson & Bell, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Maxwell Verlin
Represented By
Ian Padraic Fallon
Romanucci & Blandin, LLC
contact info
Bruno R Marasso
Romanucci & Blandin LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Marriott International, Inc.
Terminated: 05/26/2020
Represented By
Robert Michael Burke
Johnson & Bell, Ltd.
contact info
Michael Joseph Linneman
Johnson & Bell, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/25/2020 8:22 AM CDT
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020-L-003010) filed by Marriott International, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16873786.(Burke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Exhibit A-D
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burke, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 JURY Demand (Burke, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE by Marriott International, Inc. re notice of removal1 (Burke, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marriott International, Inc. by Robert Michael Burke (Burke, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marriott International, Inc. by Michael Joseph Linneman (Linneman, Michael)
Related: [-]