TOMASIAN et al v. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph H Rodriguez |
Referred: | Joel Schneider |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-03233 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 21, 2020 4:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
ROGER BALADI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VIRGINIA TOMASIAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 28, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Tue 04/28 10:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING10 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES into one case to bear the caption and case number In re Subaru Battery Drain Prod. Liab. Litig. No. 1:20-cv-3095 JHR-JS, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/27/2020. (dmr) |
|
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 04/28 10:26 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 1:20-cv-03095-JHR-JS. (dmr) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 04/28 10:28 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr) |
||
Monday, April 27, 2020 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 04/28 3:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/27/2020. (se, ) |
||
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/24 2:31 PM
NOTICE by ROGER BALADI, VIRGINIA TOMASIAN -- Notice of Related Action(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 21, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/21 1:14 PM
NOTICE by ROGER BALADI, VIRGINIA TOMASIAN -- Notice of Related Action(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 20, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Mon 04/20 3:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: A conference call is scheduled on April 27, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. (EDT) to discuss plaintiffs recently filed motion in the related cases and case management issues. The call in number is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/20/20. (Shaw, A) |
|
Friday, April 17, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/17 8:58 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases -- Unopposed Motion of Plaintiffs Seeking Consolidation of the Related Actions and Setting a Briefing Schedule for the Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel . Motion set for 5/18/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) |
||
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 04/16 5:17 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases -- Unopposed Motion of Plaintiffs Seeking Consolidation of the Related Actions and Setting a Briefing Schedule for the Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel by ROGER BALADI, VIRGINIA TOMASIAN.(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 14, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certification
Tue 04/14 5:07 PM
Certification of Adam Polk on behalf of ROGER BALADI, VIRGINIA TOMASIAN Re5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certification
Tue 04/14 5:06 PM
Certification of Jordan Elias on behalf of ROGER BALADI, VIRGINIA TOMASIAN Re4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/14 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEX M. KASHURBA on behalf of ROGER BALADI, VIRGINIA TOMASIAN (KASHURBA, ALEX) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/14 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW W. FERICH on behalf of ROGER BALADI, VIRGINIA TOMASIAN (FERICH, ANDREW) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/14 3:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam Polk by ROGER BALADI, VIRGINIA TOMASIAN.(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Benjamin F. Johns, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Adam Polk, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/14 3:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jordan Elias by ROGER BALADI, VIRGINIA TOMASIAN.(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Benjamin F. Johns, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Jordan Elias, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
qc
QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer
Tue 04/14 4:29 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Jordan Elias [4-2] & Certification of Adam Polk [5-2] submitted by Benjamin Johns on 4/14/2020 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CERTIFICATIONS ONLY WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, ) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/14 4:30 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jordan Elias ,5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam Polk . Motion set for 5/18/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) |
||
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/13 11:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIRGINIA TOMASIAN, ROGER BALADI. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/25 4:14 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) |
|
1 | 1
59
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/25 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT against SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10603119) with JURY DEMAND, filed by VIRGINIA TOMASIAN, ROGER BALADI.(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - CLRA Venue Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 03/25 2:48 PM
Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) |