Rapides Parish Police Jury v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:20-op-45111 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Western, 1:20-cv-00291 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 15, 2020 4:05 PM EDT |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
C V S Health Corp
|
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Drug Coropration
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Rapides Parish Police Jury
|
|
Plaintiff
Rapidies Parish Police Jury
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2020 4:02 PM EDT |
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from lawd on 3/25/2020.] | ||
1 | 1 283 pgs COMPLAINT against Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan P L C, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, C V S Health Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Mallinckrodt L L C, Mallinckrodt P L C, McKesson Corp, Morris & Dickson Co L L C, Noramco Inc, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4202284) filed by Rapides Parish Police Jury.(Attorney J Burton LeBlanc, IV added to party Rapides Parish Police Jury(pty:pla))(aty,LeBlanc, J) Modified on 3/9/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). [Transferred from lawd on 3/25/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
Monday, March 09, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis L L C, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan P L C, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, C V S Health Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co Inc, Mallinckrodt L L C, Mallinckrodt P L C, McKesson Corp, Morris & Dickson Co L L C, Noramco Inc, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc, Wal-Mart Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from lawd on 3/25/2020.] | |
Tuesday, March 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 5/5/2020.) Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 3/10/2020. (crt,Roaix, G) [Transferred from lawd on 3/25/2020.] | |
Wednesday, March 11, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/11/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) [Transferred from lawd on 3/25/2020.] | |
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-143) in MDL No.2804, IN RE: National Prescription Opiate Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Ohio upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from lawd on 3/25/2020.] | |
6 | 6 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 143, directing transfer to Northern District of Ohio, In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL # 2804. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from lawd on 3/25/2020.] | |
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Western. Case number 1:20-cv-00291. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |