Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alia Moses
Referred: Collis White
Case #: 2:20-cv-00026
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2020
Terminated:Sep 17, 2020
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mark A Benavides
Terminated: 09/17/2020
1069 Vista Hermosa Drive
Eagle Pass, TX 78852
Represented By
Oscar L. Cantu, Jr.
Oscar L Cantu Jr Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
All Occupants of 1069 Vista Hermosa Drive, Eagle Pass, Texas 78852
Terminated: 09/17/2020
1069 Vista Hermosa Drive
Eagle Pass, TX 78852
Plaintiff
Federal National Mortgage Assocation
Terminated: 09/17/2020
Represented By
Robert L. Negrin
Aldridge Pite, LLP
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, September 17, 2020
25 25 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 09/18 4:30 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT Federal National Mortgage Assocation, All Occupants of 1069 Vista Hermosa Drive, Eagle Pass, Texas 78852 and Mark A Benavides terminated. (jaw)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/18 4:24 PM
IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiffs claims asserted in this suit againstthe Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as set forth in Rule 41(a)(1)(B). Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all motions pending in the instant action be DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (jaw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
23 23 misc Stipulation Tue 09/15 12:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal under Fed R Civ P 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Federal National Mortgage Assocation. (Negrin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
22 22 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 09/11 12:17 PM
Returned Certified Mail Receipt of16 Certified Mail Receipt (jaw)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 09/11 12:16 PM
Returned Certified Mail Receipt of15 Certified Mail Receipt (jaw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
20 20 misc Certified Mail Receipt Wed 09/09 10:52 AM
Returned Certified Mail Receipt of14 Certified Mail Receipt (jaw)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certified Mail Receipt Wed 09/09 10:51 AM
Returned Certified Mail Receipt of13 Certified Mail Receipt (jaw)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Leave to File Document Tue 09/08 4:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counter Claim by Mark A Benavides.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Cantu, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 09/08 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oscar L. Cantu, Jr on behalf of Mark A Benavides. Attorney Oscar L. Cantu, Jr added to party Mark A Benavides(pty:dft) (Cantu, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2020
16 16 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 09/04 5:54 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of11 Order, mailed to Mark A. Benavides. (bb)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 09/04 5:51 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of11 Order to All Occupuants of 1069, Vista Hermosa Drive (bb)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 09/04 3:52 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Federal National Mortgage Assocation. (Negrin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
14 14 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 09/04 5:44 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of11 Order mailed to Mark A. Benavides. (bb)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 09/04 5:43 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of11 Order mailed to Robert L. Negrin (bb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
11 11 5 pgs order Order Wed 09/02 11:39 AM
ORDER. Signed by Judge Alia Moses. (jaw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
10 10 misc Pretrial Disclosures Mon 08/31 11:54 AM
Pretrial Disclosures by Federal National Mortgage Assocation. (Negrin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
9 9 motion Entry of Default Wed 07/29 5:38 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against All Occupants of 1609 Vista Hermosa Drive, Eagle Pass, Texas 78852 by Federal National Mortgage Assocation.. Motions referred to Judge Collis White. (Negrin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit SCRA Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Default
Monday, July 13, 2020
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/13 6:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Assocation. All Occupants of 1069 Vista Hermosa Drive, Eagle Pass, Texas 78852 served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/3/2020. (Negrin, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/13 6:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal National Mortgage Assocation. Mark A Benavides served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/3/2020. (Negrin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
6 6 misc Advisory to the Court Mon 07/06 11:32 AM
GENERAL DENIAL by Mark A Benavides. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 06/11 4:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Mark A Benavides. (ls)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 06/11 2:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Federal National Mortgage Assocation. (Negrin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 03/26 1:44 PM
Summons Issued as to All Occupants of 1069 Vista Hermosa Drive, Eagle Pass, Texas 78852, Mark A Benavides. (ls)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 03/26 12:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Federal National Mortgage Assocation.(Negrin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons on all occupants
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/26 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13390998), filed by Federal National Mortgage Assocation.(Negrin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. A - CAD Appraised Value,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. B - Substitute Trustee's Deed,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. C - Lease,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. D - Demand for Possession,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. E - Judgment for Possession
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/26 1:22 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alia Moses. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ls)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/26 1:23 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Collis White. (ls)
Related: [-]