Gustavia Home, LLC v. Criminal Court for the City of
Original Case: 1:18-cv-06800
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-01037 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 11, 2020 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Criminal Court for the City of New York
|
|
Defendant
New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
|
|
Defendant
New York City Environmental Control Board
|
|
Defendant
Transit Adjudication Bureau
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
FV-1, Inc., In Trust For Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gustavia Home, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/11/2020 4:25 AM EDT |
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Gustavia Home, LLC, FILED. [2807586] 20-1037 [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:11 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 02/26/2020, RECEIVED.[2807594] 20-1037 [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:16 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Gustavia Home, LLC, district court receipt # ANYEDC-12568473, FILED.[2807596] 20-1037 [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:17 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2807604] 20-1037 [Entered: 03/24/2020 09:19 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |